This case was last updated from PACER on 04/11/2020 at 08:15:45 (UTC).

LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Purdue Pharma LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-OP-45067

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Mallinckrodt PLC

Insys Therapeutics Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, The

Physicians Total Care Inc

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Keysource Medical, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Actavis PLC

Morris & Dickson Co LLC

Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua D. Burns

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

Braniff Building, Ste. 100, 324 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Jeffrey A. Curran

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals

15Th Floor, 211 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Kyle D. Evans

Attorney at GableGotwals

15Th Floor, 211 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Joe Michael Hampton

Attorney at Corbyn Hampton Barghols Pierce

211 North Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Robert G. McCampbell

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals

15Th Floor, 211 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

John H. Sparks

Attorney at Odom Sparks & Jones

140 Hipoint Office Bldg., 2500 S. Mcgee Drive

Norman, OK 73072

D. Todd Riddles

Attorney at Cheek Law Firm

311 N. Harvey Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Other Attorneys

Ryan A. Ray

Attorney at Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter

401 S. Boston

Tulsa, OK 74103

Kaylee Davis-Maddy

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson

Tenth Floor, 105 N. Hudson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

D. Michael McBride, III

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

321 S. Boston

Tulsa, OK 74103

Raymond E. Zschiesche

Attorney at Phillips Murrah

13Th Floor, 101 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

G. Calvin Sharpe

Attorney at Phillips Murrah

101 N Robinson, Suite 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Susan E. Huntsman

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy -Tulsa

500 Kennedy Bldg., 321 South Boston Avenue

Tulsa, OK 74103

Stuart D. Campbell

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson

Two W. Second Street

Tulsa, OK 74103

Todd A. Court

Attorney at McAfee & Taft - Oklahoma City

10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Matthew J. Sill

Attorney at Fulmer Sill Law Group

1101 North Broadway Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Robert A. Bragalone

Attorney at Gordon & Rees - Dallas

2100 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Tony G. Puckett

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 N Robinson Ave.

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) Joint Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) as to Perry Fine, M.D. and Lynn Webster, M.D. filed by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners. (Puckett, Tony) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

46 #1

*Restricted*

#46

(#46) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Eastern. Case number 6:19-cv-00362. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#45

(#45) CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804) transferring case to Northern District of Ohio. (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 02/07/2020)

34 #18

Exhibit 18 - EDVA Order

34 #14

Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order

34 #13

Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order

34 #12

Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order

34 #11

Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order

2 #15

Exhibit 15 - EOA - Anda

2 #14

Exhibit 14 - Order Granting

2 #13

Exhibit 13 - EOA - Cardinal

2 #12

Exhibit 12 - EOA - Harvard

2 #11

Exhibit 11 - Motion for Ext

2 #10

Exhibit 10 - Notice of Bankruptcy

2 #9

Exhibit 9 - Motion

2 #8

Exhibit 8 - EOA - McKesson

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Joint Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) as to Perry Fine, M.D. and Lynn Webster, M.D. filed by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners. (Puckett, Tony) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Eastern. Case number 6:19-cv-00362. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804) transferring case to Northern District of Ohio. (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Joint REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #34 MOTION to Stay ) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. ;(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kyle D. Evans on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc. (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kyle D. Evans on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert G. McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #34 MOTION to Stay ) by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners ; (With attachments)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #28 MOTION to Remand ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUPPLEMENTAL Notice of Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/29/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1312918 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 11/5/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from LeFlore County District Court, case number CJ-2019-034 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perry Fine, GCP Pharma, LLC, Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Keysource Medical, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma LP, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc., Lynn Webster by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 2/11/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less