This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2021 at 07:01:29 (UTC).

Lees v. Tilray, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Lees filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Tilray, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02734

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Lees

Defendants

Tilray, Inc.

Rebekah Dopp

Michael Auerbach

Soren Schroder

Christine St. Clare

Brendan Kennedy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua M. Lifshitz

Attorney at Lifshitz Law Firm, P.C.

1190 Broadway

Hewlett, NY 11557

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Michael Auerbach, Rebekah Dopp, Brendan Kennedy, Soren Schroder, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc.. Document filed by Steven Lees. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21cv2256. Document filed by Steven Lees..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lifshitz, Joshua) Modified on 4/1/2021 (pc). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Auerbach, Rebekah Dopp, Brendan Kennedy, Soren Schroder, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24330105)Document filed by Steven Lees..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Michael Auerbach, Rebekah Dopp, Brendan Kennedy, Soren Schroder, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc.. Document filed by Steven Lees. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-02256-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Vernon S. Broderick as possibly related to 21cv2256. (pc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joshua M. Lifshitz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Nature of suit was not selected. (pc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21cv2256. Document filed by Steven Lees..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lifshitz, Joshua) Modified on 4/1/2021 (pc). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Auerbach, Rebekah Dopp, Brendan Kennedy, Soren Schroder, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24330105)Document filed by Steven Lees..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tilray, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua M. Lifshitz