This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/12/2021 at 08:57:47 (UTC).

Lee v. Wikinson et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 Lee filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Wikinson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-00406

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Seekou Lee

Albert Lea, MN 56007

Respondents

David Pekoske

Secretary of Homeland Security Director

Sheriff Kurt Freitag

Peter Berg

Monty Wikinson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Ana H Voss

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

300 S 4Th St Ste 600

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Liles Harvey Repp

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

600 U.S Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

David John Walker

Attorney at Freeborn County Attorney's Office

411 South Broadway Avenue

Albert Lea, MN 56007

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

#8

#9

9 #1

Civil Notice - appeal

9 #2

Appeal Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(CLK) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. The Clerk of Court is directed to re-file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus #1 and application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 of petitioner Seekou L. in the matter of Seekou L. v. Wikinson, No. 21-CV-0267 (PAM/DTS). LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/26/2021.(CLG) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER from Seekou Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MTP) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Seekou L. is hereby ordered to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed without prejudice as duplicative of the other habeas proceeding. Failure to respond to this order within 30 days will result in a recommendation that this matter be dismissed without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/17/2021. (KAT) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Berg, David Pekoske, Secretary of Homeland Security Director, Monty Wikinson re #4 Notice (Other), #3 Notice of Appearance (Repp, Liles) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Peter Berg, David Pekoske, Secretary of Homeland Security Director, Monty Wikinson NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (Repp, Liles) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Liles Harvey Repp on behalf of Peter Berg, David Pekoske, Secretary of Homeland Security Director, Monty Wikinson. (Repp, Liles) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Seekou Lee. (JGK) Document QC'd on 3/5/2021 (MMG). (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Seekou Lee. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Kate M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 3/5/2021 (MMG). (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Liles Harvey Repp

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David John Walker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ana H Voss