This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:34:24 (UTC).

Lee v. Warner Media, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 Lee filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Warner Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank P. Geraci, Jr. and Marian W. Payson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-06025

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank P. Geraci, Jr.

Referral Judge

Marian W. Payson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LeTicia Lee

Rochester, NY 14692

Defendants

Warner Media, LLC

HBO Home Entertainment, Inc.

Warner Bros. Worldwide Television Distribution Inc.

NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC

CBS Broadcasting Inc.

Grammnet NH Productions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Elizabeth A. McNamara

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

13 #12

Certificate of Service

13 #11

Notice of Manual Filing

13 #10

Text of Proposed Order

13 #9

Exhibit G

13 #7

Exhibit E

13 #4

Exhibit B

13 #3

Exhibit A

13 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support

13 #13

Main Document

1 #16

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of MANUAL FILING re Exhibits D-G (four DVDs) from #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CBS Broadcasting Inc., Grammnet NH Productions, HBO Home Entertainment, Inc., NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Warner Bros. Worldwide Television Distribution Inc., Warner Media, LLC. DVDs maintained in Clerk's Office file. (JHF) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: Plaintiff must submit any materials in opposition to Defendants' motion by April 6, 2023. Defendants may file reply papers within 15 days after Plaintiff files responding papers. If Plaintiff does not respond, the Court will decide the motion based on the Amended Complaint and the Motion to Dismiss. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/7/2023. (RWW)This was mailed to: Plaintiff. (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by CBS Broadcasting Inc., Grammnet NH Productions, HBO Home Entertainment, Inc., NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Warner Bros. Worldwide Television Distribution Inc., Warner Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth A. McNamara in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Notice of Manual Filing, #12 Certificate of Service)(McNamara, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketRemark: Clerk mailed a copy of #12 Order to LeTicia Lee. (DMK) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (CBS Broadcasting Inc. answer due 3/6/2023; Grammnet NH Productions answer due 3/6/2023; HBO Home Entertainment, Inc. answer due 3/6/2023; NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC answer due 3/6/2023; Warner Bros. Worldwide Television Distribution Inc. answer due 3/6/2023; Warner Media, LLC answer due 3/6/2023.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 1/17/2023. (KAH) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Hon. Marian W. Payson, United States Magistrate Judge, for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. The parties are encouraged to consider consenting to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consent forms are available from the chambers of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. The parties may give consent to a Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and enter a final order dispositive of each motion; or such consent may be given for a limited purpose such as the disposition of a particular motion that would otherwise be before the District Judge in the absence of such consent. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 1/13/2023. (MDS) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by CBS Broadcasting Inc., Grammnet NH Productions, HBO Home Entertainment, Inc., NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Warner Bros. Worldwide Television Distribution Inc., Warner Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNamara, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk mailed copy of #9 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright to pro se plaintiff. (JHF) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to the Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JHF) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. Copy mailed to LeTicia Lee. (JHF) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Copy mailed to LeTicia Lee. (JHF) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CBS Broadcasting Inc., Grammnet NH Productions, HBO Home Entertainment, Inc., NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Warner Bros. Worldwide Television Distribution Inc., Warner Media, LLC re #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (McNamara, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warner Media, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc. for Warner Media, LLC. (McNamara, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warner Bros. Worldwide Television Distribution Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc. for Warner Bros. Worldwide Television Distribution Inc. (McNamara, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC. (McNamara, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HBO Home Entertainment, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc. for HBO Home Entertainment, Inc. (McNamara, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grammnet NH Productions. (McNamara, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Broadcasting Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent Paramount Global., Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Broadcasting Inc. (McNamara, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS Broadcasting Inc., Warner Bros. Worldwide Television Distribution Inc., HBO Home Entertainment, Inc., Grammnet NH Productions, Warner Media, LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC from Ontario County Supreme Court, case number 134539/2022. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4767358), filed by CBS Broadcasting Inc., Warner Bros. Worldwide Television Distribution Inc., HBO Home Entertainment, Inc., Grammnet NH Productions, Warner Media, LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNamara, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less