Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2020 at 09:53:52 (UTC).

Lee v. Warden

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Lee filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00180

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mario Anton Lee

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent

Warden

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Envelope

#11

(#11) MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Mario Anton Lee. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) LETTER from Mario Anton Lee to Clerk of Court regarding #7 Court-Approved Form filed by Mario Anton Lee. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Copy of file stamped Court-Approved Form mailed to pro se petitioner. (cwm) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

9 #2

Envelope

9 #1

COS

#9

(#9) LETTER from Mario Lee to Clerk of Court regarding #8 Filing Fee Received. Copy of receipt forwarded to pro se petitioner. (Attachments: #1 COS, #2 Envelope)(cmd) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) COURT-APPROVED FORM re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mario Anton Lee. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm) Modified on 10/5/2020 to correct link to correct document (cmd). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING AND DISMISS ACTION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/28/2020. (cwm) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

4 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING AND DISMISS ACTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 09/22/2020. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved 2241 Form) Copy of order and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR.(cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

1 #4

Envelope

1 #3

Receipt

1 #2

Noticre

1 #1

Attachment

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden, filed by Mario Anton Lee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Noticre, #3 Receipt, and #4 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Mario Anton Lee. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER from Mario Anton Lee to Clerk of Court regarding #7 Court-Approved Form filed by Mario Anton Lee. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Copy of file stamped Court-Approved Form mailed to pro se petitioner. (cwm) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER from Mario Lee to Clerk of Court regarding #8 Filing Fee Received. Copy of receipt forwarded to pro se petitioner. (Attachments: #1 COS, #2 Envelope)(cmd) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filing fee: $ 5.00 - receipt number WVNM001731. (cwm) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COURT-APPROVED FORM re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mario Anton Lee. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm) Modified on 10/5/2020 to correct link to correct document (cmd). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING AND DISMISS ACTION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/28/2020. (cwm) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING and #2 VNOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/24/2020. (cwm) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING AND DISMISS ACTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 09/22/2020. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved 2241 Form) Copy of order and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR.(cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Form) Original notice and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden, filed by Mario Anton Lee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Noticre, #3 Receipt, and #4 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN is a litigant