This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:21:12 (UTC).

Lee v. WalMart, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Lee filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WalMart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Jeffery S. Frensley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00603

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Suzanne Lee

Defendants

WalMart, Inc. doing business as Walmart Supercenter

Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron B. Woodard

Attorney at Law Office of Bart Durham

404 James Robertson Parkway, Suite 1712

Nashville, TN 37219

Gregory W. Callaway

Attorney at Howell & Fisher, PLLC

3310 West End Avenue, Suite 550

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference. MOTION GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to October 21, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/17/2020. (am) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#10

(#10) First MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Suzanne Lee. (Woodard, Aaron) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Substitute Party. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. added. WalMart, Inc. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/7/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

8 #1

Attachment proposed order

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by WalMart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed order)(Callaway, Gregory) Modified on 8/7/2020 (vh). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by WalMart, Inc.(Callaway, Gregory) Modified on 8/7/2020 (vh). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

4 #1

Attachment attachment to business entity disclosure

#4

(#4) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment attachment to business entity disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit - Summons

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WalMart, Inc. from Cheatham County Circuit Court, case number 6624. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3176964) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Summons, #3 Exhibit - Complaint)(am) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone reset for 10/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference. MOTION GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to October 21, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/17/2020. (am) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Suzanne Lee. (Woodard, Aaron) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Substitute Party. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. added. WalMart, Inc. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/7/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by WalMart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed order)(Callaway, Gregory) Modified on 8/7/2020 (vh). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by WalMart, Inc.(Callaway, Gregory) Modified on 8/7/2020 (vh). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory W. Callaway, Aaron B. Woodard. (am) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment attachment to business entity disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WalMart, Inc. from Cheatham County Circuit Court, case number 6624. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3176964) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Summons, #3 Exhibit - Complaint)(am) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less