This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:12:54 (UTC).

Lee v. Vannoy et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Lee filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Vannoy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Barry W Ashe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12280

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua I Lee

Angola, LA 70712

Defendant

Darrel Vannoy

Respondent

Attorney General State of Louisiana

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Louisiana Attorney General on 10/11/2019(clw) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#8

(#8) Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Criminal District Court Clerk on 10/10/2019(clw) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#7

(#7) Return of Service of HC Response Order served on Orleans District Attorney Office on 10/10/2019(am) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

6 #1

Certified Mail Receipts

#6

(#6) Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Orleans Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (mp). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: The petitioner submitted the $5.00 filing fee due in this case. The Clerk of Court SHALL satisfy the #4 Show Cause Order and remove the deficiency assigned to the Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(mp) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#4

(#4) RULE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, on or before October 24, 2019, the petitioner, Joshua I. Lee, shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a pauper application. Payment of the $5.00 filing fee or submission of a properly completed pauper application by this deadline will satisfy the Court's Order. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER WILL RESULT IN THE RECOMMENDATION THAT THIS CASE BE DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(mp) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

3 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Deficiency Cured page

#3

(#3) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Joshua I Lee. (Attachments: #1 Deficiency Cured page, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sa) Modified to remove deficiency on 10/9/2019 (sa). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/16/2019. (clw) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) DEFICIENT: PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Joshua I Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(clw) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Louisiana Attorney General on 10/11/2019(clw) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Criminal District Court Clerk on 10/10/2019(clw) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service of HC Response Order served on Orleans District Attorney Office on 10/10/2019(am) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Orleans Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (mp). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: The petitioner submitted the $5.00 filing fee due in this case. The Clerk of Court SHALL satisfy the #4 Show Cause Order and remove the deficiency assigned to the Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(mp) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing fee paid from Joshua I Lee re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5) (sa) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, on or before October 24, 2019, the petitioner, Joshua I. Lee, shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a pauper application. Payment of the $5.00 filing fee or submission of a properly completed pauper application by this deadline will satisfy the Court's Order. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER WILL RESULT IN THE RECOMMENDATION THAT THIS CASE BE DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(mp) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Joshua I Lee. (Attachments: #1 Deficiency Cured page, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sa) Modified to remove deficiency on 10/9/2019 (sa). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/16/2019. (clw) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DEFICIENT: PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Joshua I Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(clw) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less