This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2021 at 11:40:58 (UTC).

Lee v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Lee filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03725

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

Referral Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacob Lee

Defendant

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Lomena

Attorney at McDivitt Law Firm P.C.-Colorado Springs

19 East Cimarron Street

Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Defendant Attorneys

Max K. Jones, Jr.

Attorney at Montgomery Amatuzio Chase Bell Jones LLP-Denver

4100 E. Mississippi Avenue, Mountain Towers, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80246-3048

Christy Noelle Redmond

Attorney at Montgomery Amatuzio Chase Bell Jones LLP-Denver

4100 E. Mississippi Avenue, Mountain Towers, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80246-3048

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#21

(#21) REPLY In Support of its #14 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Claims for Relief Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(B)(6) by Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#20

(#20) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America All parties do not consent.. (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

19 #1

Exhibit Exh. A - Amended Complaint

#19

(#19) RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Claims for Relief Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(B)(6) filed by Plaintiff Jacob Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Amended Complaint)(Lomena, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#16

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Claims for Relief Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(B)(6) by Plaintiff Jacob Lee. (Lomena, Edward) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

14 #1

Exhibit A

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Claims for Relief Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(B)(6) by Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#6

(#13) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

1 #15

Proposed Document Notice of Filing State Court Dockete

1 #14

Proposed Document Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America from El Paso District Court, Case Number 20-CV-31682. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7640622), filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Document Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 Proposed Document Notice of Filing State Court Dockete, #16 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing State Court Docket)(Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY In Support of its #14 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Claims for Relief Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(B)(6) by Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America All parties do not consent.. (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Claims for Relief Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(B)(6) filed by Plaintiff Jacob Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Amended Complaint)(Lomena, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file its response no later than February 1, 2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/19/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM regarding #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Claims for Relief Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(B)(6) filed by Jacob Lee. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/19/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Claims for Relief Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(B)(6) by Plaintiff Jacob Lee. (Lomena, Edward) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM regarding #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Claims for Relief Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(B)(6) filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/6/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second and Fourth Claims for Relief Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(B)(6) by Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/22/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon The Travelers Indemnity Company on 11/9/2020 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon The Travelers Indemnity Company on 10/23/2020 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED Civil COMPLAINT for Damages against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, filed by Jacob Lee.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Civil COMPLAINT for Damages against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, filed by Jacob Lee.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Max K. Jones, Jr on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of AmericaAttorney Max K. Jones, Jr added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America(pty:dft) (Jones, Max) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America from El Paso District Court, Case Number 20-CV-31682. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7640622), filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Document Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 Proposed Document Notice of Filing State Court Dockete, #16 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing State Court Docket)(Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Lomena