This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:27:33 (UTC).

Lee v. The Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Lee filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00622

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jhonhenri Lee

Defendants

Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma

Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma City

Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma City doing business as YMCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon C Haupt

Attorney at Leonard & Associates PLLC

8265 S Walker Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73139

Jana Beth Leonard

Attorney at Leonard & Associates PLLC

8265 S Walker Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73139

Defendant Attorneys

Paige H Good

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Paul A Ross

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma City.(Ross, Paul) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER denying as moot #10 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/28/2019. (mb) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma filed by Jhonhenri Lee.(Leonard, Jana) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma. (Ross, Paul) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma.(Ross, Paul) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Paige H Good on behalf of Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma (Good, Paige) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma . (Ross, Paul) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Paul A Ross on behalf of Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma (Ross, Paul) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jhonhenri Lee. Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma served on 7/16/2019. (Leonard, Jana) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon C Haupt on behalf of Jhonhenri Lee (Haupt, Shannon) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Jana Beth Leonard on behalf of Jhonhenri Lee (Leonard, Jana) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma. (kmt) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma filed by Jhonhenri Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma City.(Ross, Paul) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER denying as moot #10 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/28/2019. (mb) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma filed by Jhonhenri Lee.(Leonard, Jana) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma. (Ross, Paul) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma.(Ross, Paul) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Paige H Good on behalf of Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma (Good, Paige) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma . (Ross, Paul) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Paul A Ross on behalf of Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma (Ross, Paul) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jhonhenri Lee. Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma served on 7/16/2019. (Leonard, Jana) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon C Haupt on behalf of Jhonhenri Lee (Haupt, Shannon) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Jana Beth Leonard on behalf of Jhonhenri Lee (Leonard, Jana) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2957276. (Leonard, Jana) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma. (kmt) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Oklahoma filed by Jhonhenri Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Michiana, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Aaron Ross

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige H Good