This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/12/2019 at 07:31:31 (UTC).

Lee v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 Lee filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Schneider National Carriers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00462

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prince Lee

Defendants

Schneider National Carriers, Inc.

Crete Carrier Corporation

Marvin Payne

Michael Oglesbee

Schneider Logistics, Inc.

Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.

Schneider Transport, Inc.

Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc.

Schneider Logistics Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas F Bickham, Jr

Attorney at Bickham Law PC

3120 Sw Frwy., Ste 650

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Howard Mark Burck

Attorney at Hanszen Laporte LLP

14201 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77079

Jordan Alexander Mayfield

Attorney at Naman Howell et al

400 Austin Ave, 8Th Floor

Waco, TX 76701

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit POP

1 #2

Exhibit Defendants' OA

1 #3

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit List of Parties

1 #5

Exhibit Civil Filing Details

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Marvin Payne, Schneider National Carriers, Inc., filed.(Burck, Howard) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Prince Lee, filed.(Bickham, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Crete Carrier Corporation, filed.(Mayfield, Jordan) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Crete Carrier Corporation, filed.(Mayfield, Jordan) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Marvin Payne, Schneider National Carriers, Inc., filed.(Burck, Howard) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fort Bend 240th District Court, case number 18-DCV-258030 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21848491) filed by Marvin Payne, Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POP, #2 Exhibit Defendants' OA, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit List of Parties, #5 Exhibit Civil Filing Details)(Burck, Howard) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS TRANSPORTATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc is a litigant