This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 09:47:44

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by Lee against Lopez in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 1:19-CV-03345
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Prison Condition
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman
  • Courthouse Illinois Northern District

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Kelvin Lee
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant Lopez
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#8

(#8) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Kelvin Lee for leave to procee...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) LETTER from Kelvin Lee dated 6/28/19. (Exhibit) (Envelo...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) LETTER from Kelvin Lee dated 6/17/19. (Envelope postmar...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in ...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Kelvin Lee for attorney representat...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Kelvin Lee for leave to procee...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Fees Apply
1 #1

Envelope

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Kelvin Lee (Exhibit...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • (#8) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Kelvin Lee for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibit) (Envelope not postmarked). (tt, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
  • 07/09/2019
  • (#7) LETTER from Kelvin Lee dated 6/28/19. (Exhibit) (Envelope not postmarked) (tt, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#6) LETTER from Kelvin Lee dated 6/17/19. (Envelope postmarked 6/19/19) (tt, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied as incomplete. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this case, he must (1) address the filing fee, by either (a) prepaying the $400 filing fee; or (b) submitting a fully completed and signed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that includes a trust fund account statement covering November 8, 2018, through May 8, 2019, as well as a written explanation of why he should be allowed to proceed without full prepayment of the filing fee despite having received more than $3,000 in income in the previous year; and (2) show good cause in writing (in other words, provide a written explanation) why sanctions up to and including dismissal should not be imposed based on false statements in his in forma pauperis application, along with a trust fund account statement covering May 8, 2018, through the date of Plaintiff's response, and the information requested below. If Plaintiff fails to address the filing fee and show good cause in writing by July 15, 2019, this case will be summarily dismissed. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/14/2019. Mailed notice (tt, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Kelvin Lee for attorney representation (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Kelvin Lee for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibit) (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#1) RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Kelvin Lee (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope not postmarked) (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.