This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2021 at 06:13:18 (UTC).

Lee v. Equity Trust Company

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Lee filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Equity Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Philip Calabrese and Thomas M. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01052

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Philip Calabrese

Referral Judge

Thomas M. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Lee

St. Augustine, FL 32086

Defendant

Equity Trust Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Paul R. Harris

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne - Cleveland

1100 Skylight Office Tower, 1660 West Second Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

Jeremy A. Moseley

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell

370 Seventeenth Street

Denver, CO 80202

Hannah Rachel Seifert

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

#10

#13

#16

#17

#20

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCopy of Order of Referral mailed to Howard Lee at 500 Castano Street, St. Augustine, FL 32086 on 5/20/2021. (Y,A) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketOrder [non-document]: referring case to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker to handle all pretrial matters. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 5/20/2021. (Y,A) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #20 Magistrate Consent Form and docket sheet mailed to Howard Lee, 500 Castano Street, St. Augustine, FL 32086 and Hannah Rachel Seifert, Spencer Fane LLP-Denver, 1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000, Denver, CO 80203 on 05/21/2021. (M,TL) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,TL) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketJudge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Colorado. Case number 1:21-cv-01041. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/20/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio by Defendant Equity Trust Company. (Harris, Paul) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Russell Harris on behalf of Equity Trust CompanyAttorney Paul Russell Harris added to party Equity Trust Company(pty:dft) (Harris, Paul) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #6 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Equity Trust Company. (Moseley, Jeremy) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction and Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due by 6/9/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/16/2021. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 6/23/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on April 15, 2021. (rvill, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#8) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT Negligence; Breach of Fiduciary Duty; Wrongful Filing of an Information Return Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress; Fraudulent Misrepresentation; and Fraudulent Omission; and also requesting Declatory Relief against Equity Trust Company, filed by Howard Lee.(cpomm, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Equity Trust Company on 03/25/21 (cpomm, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT for Negligence; Breach of Fiduciary Duty; and Wrongful Filing of an Information Return against Equity Trust Company, filed by Howard Lee.(cpomm, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Seifert, Hannah) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equity Trust Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2021cv86. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7818197), filed by Equity Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - State Court - Denver County District Court Docket, #3 State Court - Complaint, #4 State Court - District Court Civil Summons, #5 State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #7 State Court - Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #8 State Court - Affidavit of Service, #9 State Court - Letter to Court regarding Amended Complaint and Service, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moseley, Jeremy) [Transferred from cod on 5/20/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUITY TRUST CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Robert Harris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannah R. Seifert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Andrew Moseley