This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 12:59:54 (UTC).

Lee v. Equity Trust Company

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Lee filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Equity Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. Brooke Jackson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01041

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Brooke Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Lee

St. Augustine, FL 32086

Defendant

Equity Trust Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy A. Moseley

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Hannah Rachel Seifert

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Paul Russell Harris

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP-Cleveland

1660 West 2Nd Street, Skylight Office Tower, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113-1448

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE re 19 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents. Case transferred from Colorado has been opened in the Northern District of Ohio as case 1:21-cv-01052. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docket(#19) Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio at InterdistrictTransfer_OHND@ohnd.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/20/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio by Defendant Equity Trust Company. (Harris, Paul) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Russell Harris on behalf of Equity Trust CompanyAttorney Paul Russell Harris added to party Equity Trust Company(pty:dft) (Harris, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 6/23/2021 before Magistrate Judge Varholak is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that the parties confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 6/16/2021 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/3/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01041-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Equity Trust Company All parties do not consent.. (Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Howard Lee, 500 Castano Street, St. Augustine, FL 32086. Text Only Entry (jgonz, ) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Equity Trust Company answer due 5/19/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/22/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, ) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #6 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Equity Trust Company. (Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction and Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due by 6/9/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/16/2021. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 6/23/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on April 15, 2021. (rvill, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#8) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT Negligence; Breach of Fiduciary Duty; Wrongful Filing of an Information Return Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress; Fraudulent Misrepresentation; and Fraudulent Omission; and also requesting Declatory Relief against Equity Trust Company, filed by Howard Lee.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Equity Trust Company on 03/25/21 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT for Negligence; Breach of Fiduciary Duty; and Wrongful Filing of an Information Return against Equity Trust Company, filed by Howard Lee.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equity Trust Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2021cv86. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7818197), filed by Equity Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - State Court - Denver County District Court Docket, #3 State Court - Complaint, #4 State Court - District Court Civil Summons, #5 State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #7 State Court - Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #8 State Court - Affidavit of Service, #9 State Court - Letter to Court regarding Amended Complaint and Service, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUITY TRUST CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannah R. Seifert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Andrew Moseley