This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2022 at 07:35:34 (UTC).

Lee v. Cook Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 Lee filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Cook Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane M. Beckering and Sally J. Berens. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00644

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane M. Beckering

Referral Judge

Sally J. Berens

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Myra L. Lee

Defendants

Cook Incorporated

Cook Medical Incorporated

Cook Group Incorporated

Cook Medical, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason J. Thompson

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz PC

One Towne Sq., Ste. 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC filed by Myra L. Lee (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cook Incorporated, #3 Summons Cook Medical Incorporated, #4 Summons Cook Group Incorporated, #5 Summons Cook Medical, LLC) (Thompson, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Cook Incorporated

1 #3

Summons Cook Medical Incorporated

1 #4

Summons Cook Group Incorporated

1 #5

Summons Cook Medical, LLC

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Jane M. Beckering (ns) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC (ns) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Southern District of Illinois; case transferred to Southern District of Illinois under MDL No. 2570, Lee v. Cook Incorporated et al (slk) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT from Southern District of Illinois, of receipt of WDMI transfer case, assigning case number 3:22-cv-1879 (slk) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Southern Illinois (slk) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Southern District of Illinois; case transferred to Southern District of Illinois under MDL No. 2570, Lee v. Cook Incorporated et al (slk) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC (ns) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Jane M. Beckering (ns) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Myra L. Lee in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6792872 (Thompson, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC filed by Myra L. Lee (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cook Incorporated, #3 Summons Cook Medical Incorporated, #4 Summons Cook Group Incorporated, #5 Summons Cook Medical, LLC) (Thompson, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason J. Thompson