This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2019 at 07:41:59 (UTC).

Lee v. Bradley

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 Lee filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Bradley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Staci G Cornelius and Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-01306

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Staci G Cornelius

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Yong Cha Lee

Aliceville, AL 35442

Respondent

Patrica Bradley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Jason R Cheek

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1801 Fourth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Exhibit Attachment

#6

(#6) RESPONSE to re #3 Order to Show Cause dated August 30, 2019 filed by Patrica Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment)(Cheek, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Yong Cha Lee.(KAM) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Cheek on behalf of Patrica Bradley (Cheek, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the respondent appear and show cause in writing within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/30/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER denying #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/4/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. If Petitioner fails to correct the deficient pleading in compliance with this notice within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this notice, the court will dismiss this case for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/19/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER. The petitioner shall have twenty (20) days from the date of this order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments she may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/1/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Order, dated August 30, 2019 by Patrica Bradley. (Cheek, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER denying #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/4/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER. The petitioner shall have twenty (20) days from the date of this order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments she may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/1/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE to re #3 Order to Show Cause dated August 30, 2019 filed by Patrica Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment)(Cheek, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Order, dated August 30, 2019 by Patrica Bradley. (Cheek, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Cheek on behalf of Patrica Bradley (Cheek, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the respondent appear and show cause in writing within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/30/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Filing Fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number B4601100224. (JLC) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. If Petitioner fails to correct the deficient pleading in compliance with this notice within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this notice, the court will dismiss this case for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/19/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Yong Cha Lee.(KAM) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.