This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:02:12 (UTC).

LEE v. BOYLE et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BOYLE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00595

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN H. LEE

Defendants

KIA BOYLE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary G. Hanner

Attorney at HANNER HANNER & HANNER

Old Parke State Bank Building, Box 122

Rockville, IN 47872

Keith Logan Johnson

Attorney at JOHNSON LAW OFFICE

118 North 3Rd Street

Terre Haute, IN 47807

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Douglas Cody

Attorney at HUME SMITH GEDDES GREEN & SIMMONS

54 Monument Circle, 4Th Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Rachana Nagin Fischer

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MARGINAL ENTRY - Dismissal with prejudice as to the United States of America only acknowledged. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/30/2020. (KAA) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION of Dismissal [JOINT], as to Defendant KIA BOYLE, Plaintiff JOHN H. LEE, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/28/2020. Motions referred to Mark J. Dinsmore.(KAA) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2020. Discovery due by 11/13/2020. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/27/2020. (GD) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#19

(#19) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/24/2020. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 12:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #131, United States Courthouse, 921 Ohio Street, Terre Haute, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS - In the event an agreed protective order is required in this matter, the parties shall file a motion seeking the entry of such an order, attaching thereto the proposed protective order. The parties shall either use the Courts Uniform Protective Order http://www.insd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders or explain in the motion why a different form of order is being proposed. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/27/2020.(KAA) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#17

(#17) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant KIA BOYLE . (Cody, Christopher) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary G. Hanner on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN H. LEE. (Hanner, Gary) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#15

(#15) EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal [Document 1-3] State Court Record (Docket, Complaint, Johnson Appearance, Hanner Appearance, Boyle Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Boyle Summons, Mitchell Appearance, Boyle Answer, Motion to Amend Complaint, Amended Complaint, South Summons, Order Granting Motion to Amend, South Notice of Service of Summons, Boyle Answer, United States Appearance, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fischer, Rachana) Modified on 1/22/2020 to update docket text description (KAA). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Unless the parties agree there are compelling reasons for a departure, the CMP shall be in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/20/2019.(RSF) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Enlargement of Time to Answer, or Otherwise Plead, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (RSF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (RSF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachana Nagin Fischer on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Summons; Amended Complaint; Certificate of Scope of Employment

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#15) EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal [Document 1-3] State Court Record (Docket, Complaint, Johnson Appearance, Hanner Appearance, Boyle Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Boyle Summons, Mitchell Appearance, Boyle Answer, Motion to Amend Complaint, Amended Complaint, South Summons, Order Granting Motion to Amend, South Notice of Service of Summons, Boyle Answer, United States Appearance, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fischer, Rachana) Modified on 1/22/2020 to update docket text description (KAA). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MARGINAL ENTRY - Dismissal with prejudice as to the United States of America only acknowledged. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/30/2020. (KAA) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION of Dismissal [JOINT], as to Defendant KIA BOYLE, Plaintiff JOHN H. LEE, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/28/2020. Motions referred to Mark J. Dinsmore.(KAA) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2020. Discovery due by 11/13/2020. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/27/2020. (GD) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/24/2020. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 12:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #131, United States Courthouse, 921 Ohio Street, Terre Haute, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS - In the event an agreed protective order is required in this matter, the parties shall file a motion seeking the entry of such an order, attaching thereto the proposed protective order. The parties shall either use the Courts Uniform Protective Order http://www.insd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders or explain in the motion why a different form of order is being proposed. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/27/2020.(KAA) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant KIA BOYLE . (Cody, Christopher) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary G. Hanner on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN H. LEE. (Hanner, Gary) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal [Document 1-3] State Court Record (Docket, Complaint, Johnson Appearance, Hanner Appearance, Boyle Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Boyle Summons, Mitchell Appearance, Boyle Answer, Motion to Amend Complaint, Amended Complaint, South Summons, Order Granting Motion to Amend, South Notice of Service of Summons, Boyle Answer, United States Appearance, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fischer, Rachana) Modified on 1/22/2020 to update docket text description (KAA). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED ORDER: The Court hereby amends its Order dated January 16, 2020 #11 as follows: On or before January 23, 2020, Defendant United States of America is hereby ordered to file in this matter a supplemental and complete record of the underlying state court action, in the format required by Local Rule 81-2. All other requirements of the Court's Order dated January 16, 2020 #11 remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/21/2020. (GD) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference and to Stay Case Deadlines, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kimberly A. Herbst)(Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Unless the parties agree there are compelling reasons for a departure, the CMP shall be in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/20/2019.(RSF) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Enlargement of Time to Answer, or Otherwise Plead, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (RSF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (RSF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachana Nagin Fischer on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Parke County Circuit Court 1, case number 61C01-1910-CT-000434, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons; Amended Complaint; Certificate of Scope of Employment)(Fischer, Rachana) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less