This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:31:46 (UTC).

Yeong Lee v. Better Body Consulting, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Yeong Lee filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Better Body Consulting, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02041

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YEONG LEE

Defendants

BETTER BODY CONSULTING, INC. doing business as WHOLESALE NUTRITION CENTER

DOES 1 to 10

Lindley-Crocker Enterprises

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason J Kim

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Jason T Yoon

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by PLAINTIFF Yeong Lee pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Better Body Consulting, Inc.. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#12

(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #10 as to Defendant Lindley-Crocker Enterprises. (jp) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#11

(#11) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #10 Yeong Lee. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#10

(#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant LINDLEY-CROCKER ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Yeong Lee(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#9

(#9) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (mku) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Better Body Consulting, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 YEONG LEE. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff YEONG LEE. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28684432 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party YEONG LEE(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by PLAINTIFF Yeong Lee pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Better Body Consulting, Inc.. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #10 as to Defendant Lindley-Crocker Enterprises. (jp) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #10 Yeong Lee. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant LINDLEY-CROCKER ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Yeong Lee(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (mku) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Better Body Consulting, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 YEONG LEE. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff YEONG LEE. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28684432 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party YEONG LEE(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less