This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 11:58:42 (UTC).

LEE v. BARR et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 LEE filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against BARR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02559

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL LEWIS LEE

Terre Haute, IN 47802

Defendants

JOHN DOES I-X

UTTAM DHILLON

KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER

T.J. WATSON

JOSEPH MCCLAIN

RADM CHRIS A. BINA

JEFFREY E. KRUEGER

WILLIAM P. BARR

WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D.

Not Classified By Court

DUSTIN LEE HONKEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elizabeth Hagerty

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Amelia J. Schmidt

Attorney at KAISER DILLON, PLLC

1099 14Th Street, Suite 800 West

Washington, DC 20005

Jonathan Jeffress

Attorney at KAISER DILLON, PLLC

1099 14Th Street, Suite 800 West

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#1

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET (Amended) by DANIEL LEWIS LEE re #1 Complaint,,,, filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE.(Hagerty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #11

Summons to Uttam Dhillon

1 #12

Summons to Kathleen Hawk Sawyer

1 #15

Summons to T.J. Watson

1 #6

Exhibit F - BP-8 administrative remedy grievance form and supplement

1 #5

Exhibit E - July 31, 2019 letter regarding Lees execution date

1 #8

Exhibit H - Letter from House Committee on Oversight and Reform to Acting Direct

1 #16

Summons to William E. Wilson, M.D.

1 #2

Exhibit B - 2008 Addendum to Bureau of Prisons Execution Protocol

#18

(#18) ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by DUSTIN LEE HONKEN (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Jeffress, Jonathan) Modified on 11/19/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

17 #1

Exhibit

17 #44

(#17) ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .REPLY to opposition to motion re (29 in 1:19-mc-00145-TSC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DUSTIN LEE HONKEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00145-TSC, 1:19-cv-02559-TSC(Jeffress, Jonathan) Modified on 11/19/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

16 #13

Exhibit

16 #5

Exhibit

16 #15

Exhibit

16 #14

Exhibit

16 #9

Exhibit

16 #8

Exhibit

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #18 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; emailed to jjeffress@kaiserdillon.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Documents should only be filed in the Master Case 19mc145. Do not select the spread text option when filing. (ztd, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #17 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to jjeffress@kaiserdillon.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Documents should only be filed in the Master Case 19mc145. Do not select the spread text option when filing. (ztd, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by DUSTIN LEE HONKEN (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Jeffress, Jonathan) Modified on 11/19/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .REPLY to opposition to motion re (29 in 1:19-mc-00145-TSC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DUSTIN LEE HONKEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00145-TSC, 1:19-cv-02559-TSC(Jeffress, Jonathan) Modified on 11/19/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by DUSTIN LEE HONKEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00145-TSC et al.(Schmidt, Amelia) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM P. BARR served on 9/3/2019; RADM CHRIS A. BINA served on 9/3/2019; UTTAM DHILLON served on 9/23/2019; JEFFREY E. KRUEGER served on 9/3/2019; JOSEPH MCCLAIN served on 9/4/2019; KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER served on 9/3/2019; T.J. WATSON served on 9/4/2019; WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D. served on 9/4/2019 (Van Tol, Pieter) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to UTTAM DHILLON (ztd) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE.(Hagerty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to opposition to motion re (2 in 1:19-mc-00145-TSC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (The filing relates to Bourgeois v. United States Department of Justice, et al., No. 12-cv-0782-TSC) filed by ALFRED BOURGEOIS. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00145-TSC et al.(Kursman, Alexander) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (ztd) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mallik Yamusah, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 390 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 918-3701. Fax No. - (212) 918-3100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6347086. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL LEWIS LEE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mallik Yamusah, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hagerty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John D. Beck, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 390 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 918-3076. Fax No. - (212) 918-3100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6347074. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL LEWIS LEE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Beck, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hagerty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Pieter Van Tol, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 390 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 909-0661. Fax No. - (212) 918-3100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6347063. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL LEWIS LEE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pieter Van Tol, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hagerty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to JOSEPH MCCLAIN. (ztd) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE.(Hagerty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR, RADM CHRIS A. BINA, UTTAM DHILLON, JEFFREY E. KRUEGER, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, T.J. WATSON, WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET (Amended) by DANIEL LEWIS LEE re #1 Complaint,,,, filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE.(Hagerty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DANIEL LEWIS LEE. Case related to Case No. 05-cv-2337 (TSC); 07-cv-2145 (TSC); 12-cv-0782 (TSC); 13-cv-0938 (TSC). (Hagerty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR, RADM CHRIS A. BINA, UTTAM DHILLON, JOHN DOES I-X, JEFFREY E. KRUEGER, JOSEPH MCCLAIN, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, T.J. WATSON, WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6339786) filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2004 Bureau of Prisons Execution Protocol, #2 Exhibit B - 2008 Addendum to Bureau of Prisons Execution Protocol, #3 Exhibit C - 2019 Addendum to Bureau of Prisons Execution Protocol, #4 Exhibit D - July 25, 2019 letter regarding Lees execution date, #5 Exhibit E - July 31, 2019 letter regarding Lees execution date, #6 Exhibit F - BP-8 administrative remedy grievance form and supplement, #7 Exhibit G - Letter from House Committee on Oversight and Reform to Attorney General Barr, #8 Exhibit H - Letter from House Committee on Oversight and Reform to Acting Director Hurwitz, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons to William P. Barr, #11 Summons to Uttam Dhillon, #12 Summons to Kathleen Hawk Sawyer, #13 Summons to Jeffrey E. Krueger, #14 Summons to RADM Chris A. Bina, #15 Summons to T.J. Watson, #16 Summons to William E. Wilson, M.D.)(Hagerty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.