This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:19:43 (UTC).

Lee v. Ashford University

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Lee filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Ashford University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05507

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chinesha Lee

Defendant

Ashford University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dennis Robert Kurz

Attorney at Kurz Law Group, LLC

Building 17, Suite 200, 1640 Powers Ferry Rd., Se

Marietta, GA 30067

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony T. King

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer-AZ

400 East Van Buren Street, One Arizona Center

Phoenix, AZ 85004-0001

Stephanie Rae Hudson

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP-GA

Suite 2300, 999 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3996

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Chinesha Lee (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9156749). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/02/19. (smj) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#10

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Rae Hudson on behalf of Ashford University (Hudson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by Chinesha Lee. Ashford University served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ashford University. (ah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ashford University identifying Corporate Parent Zovio for Ashford University. (Hudson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Ashford University. Discovery ends on 6/19/2020.(Hudson, Stephanie) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony T King re #10 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jed) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Application of Anthony T King for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 1/24/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony T. King Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9272527).. Attorney Anthony T. King added appearing on behalf of Ashford University (pmb) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ashford University identifying Corporate Parent Zovio for Ashford University. (Hudson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Ashford University. Discovery ends on 6/19/2020.(Hudson, Stephanie) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony T. King Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9272527).by Ashford University. (Hudson, Stephanie) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Rae Hudson on behalf of Ashford University (Hudson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by Chinesha Lee. Ashford University served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/02/19. (smj) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ashford University. (ah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Chinesha Lee (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9156749). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.