Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2021 at 06:33:58 (UTC).

Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc. et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry E. Hudson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00964

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry E. Hudson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David C. Brosius doing business as Martins Auto Body Works, Inc.

Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc.

Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc.

Defendants

Donegal Mutual Insurance Company

Travelers Commercial Insurance Company

State Farm General Insurance Company

The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company

Geico Advantage Insurance Company

Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company

Nationwide General Insurance Company

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Erie Insurance Exchange

LM Insurance Corporation

General Insurance Company Of America

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

LM General Insurance Company

Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company

21st Century Assurance Company

Geico Choice Insurance Company

GEICO Secure Insurance Company

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Arthur Eaves, Jr.

Attorney at Eaves Law Firm, LLC

101 North State Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Anthony French

Attorney at Barley Snyder

1 South Market Square, 12Th Floor, Po Box 1146

Harrisburg, PA 17108

Holly Lechliter Cline

Attorney at Rhoads & Sinon, LLP

1 S Market Sq - 12Th Floor, Po Box 1146

Harrisburg, PA 17108-1146

Gordon A. Coffee

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (DC)

1700 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Norman K. Beck

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

35 W Wacker Drive, Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60601

Jamie L. Halavais

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

2415 E. Camelback Road, Suite 420

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Ian Matthew Fischer

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

2415 E. Camelback Road, Suite 420

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Steven Franklin Griffith, Jr.

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (NA-NO)

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jeffery D. Ubersax

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114-1190

Richard L. Fenton

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

233 S Wacker Drive, Suite 5900

Chicago, IL 60606-6361

Mark L. Hanover

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

233 S Wacker Dr Ste 5900

Chicago, IL 60606-6361

Lori J. Caldwell

Attorney at Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, PA

300 S Orange Avenue, Suite 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

David L. Yohai

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP

767 Fifth Ave

New York, NY 10153-0119

Other Attorneys

Thomas G. Rohback

Attorney at Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider, LLP

90 State House Square

Hartford, CT 06103

Tiffany L. Powers

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W Peachtree Street., Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Robert Francis Reklaitis

Attorney at LeClairRyan

815 Connecticut Avenue Nw, Suite 620

Washington, DC 20006-4053

Elizabeth E. Stanulis Skilling

Attorney at Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman

Po Box 70280

Richmond, VA 23255

Michael Patrick Kenny

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

One Atlantic Center Ste 4900, 1201 W Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Drew Alan Hillier

Attorney at Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP

90 State House Square

Hartford, CT 060130

Michael L. McCluggage

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 S Michigan Ave Ste 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

64 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

200 #1

Errata A

#200

(#200) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Leo Steinmetz and Certification of Local Counsel James L. Hoyle Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7763427. by Safe Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Errata A)(Hoyle, James) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#199

(#199) ORDER that this matter is before the Court on Defendant Property and CasualtyInsurance Company of Hartford's Motion to Withdraw Appearance of pro hac vice attorney Drew A. Hillier (ECF No. #198 ). It appearing appropriate to do so, the Motion is GRANTED. Drew A. Hillier, Esquire is TERMINATED as counsel in this matter. It is so ORDFERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 04/22/2021. (walk, ) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#198

(#198) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Drew A. Hiller) by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. (Lavender, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#197

(#197) ORDER (Briefing Schedule). The Court ORDERS the parties to file a position paper regarding whether this Court should retain jurisdiction or if the matter should be remanded to the appropriate Virginia court. The position paper shall be no longer than five (5) pages and shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this Order. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United STates District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/14/2021. (sbea,) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#196

(#196) ORDER that the Motion is GRANTED and Jason C. Hicks is granted leave to withdraw as counsel in the above-referenced proceeding pending before this Court. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/22/2021. (sbea,) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

195 #1

Proposed Order

#195

(#195) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jason) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#194

(#194) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Spotswood de Witt on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (de Witt, Alexander) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice Francis Mullins on behalf of Donegal Mutual Insurance Company (Mullins, Maurice) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/20/2014)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance, AIG Property Casualty Company, Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Elephant Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, General Insurance Company Of America, Government Employees Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, and Virginia Farm Bureau Town and Country Insurance Company. Brielle from Plaintiff's attorney's office will come in on 11/12/14 to pick up summons. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/10/2014)

1 #6

Receipt

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance, AIG Property Casualty Company, Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Elephant Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, General Insurance Company Of America, Government Employees Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, and Virginia Farm Bureau Town and Country Insurance Company (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 34683027194), filed by Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc., Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., and David C. Brosius, Art Walker Auto Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(jsmi, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/10/2014)

226 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#200) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Leo Steinmetz and Certification of Local Counsel James L. Hoyle Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7763427. by Safe Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Errata A)(Hoyle, James) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#199) ORDER that this matter is before the Court on Defendant Property and CasualtyInsurance Company of Hartford's Motion to Withdraw Appearance of pro hac vice attorney Drew A. Hillier (ECF No. #198 ). It appearing appropriate to do so, the Motion is GRANTED. Drew A. Hillier, Esquire is TERMINATED as counsel in this matter. It is so ORDFERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 04/22/2021. (walk, ) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#198) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Drew A. Hiller) by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. (Lavender, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#197) ORDER (Briefing Schedule). The Court ORDERS the parties to file a position paper regarding whether this Court should retain jurisdiction or if the matter should be remanded to the appropriate Virginia court. The position paper shall be no longer than five (5) pages and shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this Order. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United STates District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/14/2021. (sbea,) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#196) ORDER that the Motion is GRANTED and Jason C. Hicks is granted leave to withdraw as counsel in the above-referenced proceeding pending before this Court. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/22/2021. (sbea,) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#195) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jason) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#194) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Spotswood de Witt on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (de Witt, Alexander) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#193) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Zuk, Peter Nicholas) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#192) ORDER granting #188 Motion for Pro hac vice re Michael Carpenter. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/11/2021. (asho, ) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#191) NOTICE of Appearance by James Leslie Hoyle on behalf of Safe Auto Insurance Company (Hoyle, James) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
186 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Coffee, Gordon) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon A. Coffee on behalf of TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Appearance of Counsel)(Coffee, Gordon) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company for the Admission of Holly L. Cline, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/24/2014. (walk, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company for the Admission of Thomas A. French, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/24/2014. (walk, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Holly Lechliter Cline and Certification of Local Counsel Maurice Mullins Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4203244. by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Mullins, Maurice) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Anthony French and Certification of Local Counsel Maurice Mullins Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4203230. by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Mullins, Maurice) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Mullins, Maurice) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice Francis Mullins on behalf of Donegal Mutual Insurance Company (Mullins, Maurice) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance, AIG Property Casualty Company, Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Elephant Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, General Insurance Company Of America, Government Employees Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, and Virginia Farm Bureau Town and Country Insurance Company. Brielle from Plaintiff's attorney's office will come in on 11/12/14 to pick up summons. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance, AIG Property Casualty Company, Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Elephant Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, General Insurance Company Of America, Government Employees Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, and Virginia Farm Bureau Town and Country Insurance Company (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 34683027194), filed by Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc., Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., and David C. Brosius, Art Walker Auto Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(jsmi, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO Secure Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where 21st Century Assurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico Choice Insurance Company is a litigant