This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2021 at 08:55:53 (UTC).

Lee et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Lee filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond P. Moore and Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01957

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Samuel Lee

Kyung Lee

Defendant

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colleen Therese Calandra

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan PA-Denver

1600 Broadway, Suite 1651

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Brian John Spano

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Elliot Reaven

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Holly C. White

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/21/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for August 24, 2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/16/2021. (agarc, ) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#14

(#14) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Kyung Lee, Samuel Lee. (Calandra, Colleen) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#13

(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America All parties do not consent.. (Reaven, Elliot) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Elliot Reaven (Reaven, Elliot) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Holly C. White added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (White, Holly) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elliot Reaven on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Elliot Reaven added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Reaven, Elliot) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Brian John Spano added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued by Plaintiffs Kyung Lee, Samuel Lee. (Calandra, Colleen) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/16/2021 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/9/2021 by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/20/2021. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Safeco Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7966183)Attorney Colleen Therese Calandra added to party Kyung Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Colleen Therese Calandra added to party Samuel Lee(pty:pla), filed by Samuel Lee, Kyung Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Calandra, Colleen) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/21/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for August 24, 2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/16/2021. (agarc, ) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER The Court grants the parties request in #14 Proposed Scheduling Order to attend the Scheduling Conference by telephone. The parties may access the hearing by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/16/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, ) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Kyung Lee, Samuel Lee. (Calandra, Colleen) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America All parties do not consent.. (Reaven, Elliot) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #11 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information filed by attorney Elliot Reaven. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Elliot Reaven (Reaven, Elliot) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Holly C. White added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (White, Holly) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elliot Reaven on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Elliot Reaven added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Reaven, Elliot) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Brian John Spano added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued by Plaintiffs Kyung Lee, Samuel Lee. (Calandra, Colleen) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/16/2021 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/9/2021 by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/20/2021. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/20/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/20/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Safeco Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7966183)Attorney Colleen Therese Calandra added to party Kyung Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Colleen Therese Calandra added to party Samuel Lee(pty:pla), filed by Samuel Lee, Kyung Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Calandra, Colleen) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holly C. White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian John Spano