This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2020 at 08:46:51 (UTC).

Lee et al v. Learfield Communications, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Lee filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Learfield Communications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Lance M Africk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00839

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Lance M Africk

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Business Moves Consulting, Inc.

Brandmixer, Inc.

Curtis Bordenave

Paige Lee

Defendants

MyPlates, Inc.

Thaddeus Reed d/b/a Reed Enterprise

Learfield Communications, LLC a/k/a CLC Learfield IMG College

Anthony Lawrence Collection, LLC

Defron Fobb

Learfield Communications, LLC

Thaddeus Reed

Reed Enterprise

CLC Learfield IMG College

Collegiate Licensing Co., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Patrick Henican

Attorney at Riess LeMieux, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Andrew T. Lilly

Attorney at Lilly, PLLC

4907 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70115

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin W. Janke

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Camalla M. Kimbrough

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Kent A. Lambert

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Proposed Order

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response is GRANTED. Defendant Collegiate Licensing Co., LLC shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint no later than JUNE 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on April 22, 2020. (mp) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Learfield Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Camalla M. Kimbrough added to party Learfield Communications, LLC(pty:dft).(Kimbrough, Camalla) Modified text on 4/22/2020 (mp). (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO 120 Report Regarding Patent & Trademark. (mp) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Business Moves Consulting, Inc. (Lilly, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Brandmixer, Inc. (Lilly, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Anthony Lawrence Collection, LLC, Defron Fobb, Learfield Communications, LLC a/k/a CLC Learfield IMG College, MyPlates, Inc., Thaddeus Reed d/b/a Reed Enterprise. SERVICE BY WAIVER. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8207504) filed by Brandmixer, Inc., Business Moves Consulting, Inc., Curtis Bordenave, Paige Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Thomas Patrick Henican added to party Curtis Bordenave(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas Patrick Henican added to party Brandmixer, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas Patrick Henican added to party Business Moves Consulting, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas Patrick Henican added to party Paige Lee(pty:pla).(Henican, Thomas) Modified text on 3/11/2020 (mp). (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Business Moves Consulting is a litigant

Latest cases where Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Camalla M Kimbrough