This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:51:23 (UTC).

Lee et al v. Hill et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Lee filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Hill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jesse M. Furman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-09220

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brandon Lee

Glen Keith DeMeritt, III

Defendants

Does 1-10

Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar

Russell James Chell, Jr.

Rosario Peter Lenzo, IV

Alex Facio

David Charles Marshal Biral

Denzel Michael-Akil Baptiste

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Klenord Raphael

Unxque

Sony Music Holdings, Inc.

Montero Lamar Hill

Sony Music Entertainment a New York company doing business as Columbia Records

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Alan Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger / Burroughs

603 Rose Ave

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorneys

Peter J Anderson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 S. Figueroa St.,, Suite 2400, 90017

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

Adam Ivan Rich

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Nicholas Joseph Tardif

Attorney at Universal Music Group, Inc.

1755 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#24

#23

22 #2

Text of Proposed Order

22 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Holdings, Inc..(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Holdings, Inc..(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Peter James Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Songs of Universal, Inc..(Rich, Adam) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi, S.A. for Songs of Universal, Inc.. Document filed by Songs of Universal, Inc..(Rich, Adam) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Peter James Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18116807. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Peter James Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18116807. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Ivan Rich on behalf of Songs of Universal, Inc.. (Rich, Adam) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Sony Music Entertainment answer due 12/2/2019; Sony Music Holdings, Inc. answer due 12/2/2019. (jca) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 18. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/28/2019) (jca) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sony Music Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Glen Keith DeMeritt, III, Brandon Lee. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sony Music Entertainment, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Glen Keith DeMeritt, III, Brandon Lee. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on December 17, 2019 at 4:15 pm in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/7/19) (yv) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, Denzel Michael-Akil Baptiste, David Charles Marshal Biral, Russell James Chell, Jr, Does 1-10, Alex Facio, Montero Lamar Hill, Rosario Peter Lenzo, IV, Klenord Raphael, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Holdings, Inc., Unxque. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17720840)Document filed by Glen Keith DeMeritt, III, Brandon Lee.(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY MUSIC HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Songs of Universal, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A Burroughs