This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2019 at 07:13:55 (UTC).

LEDFORD et al v 3M COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 LEDFORD filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03276

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kevin Frame

BRANDON GREGORY

JOHN HARRISON

David Hunt

Jason Daniels

Terwayne Jones

Jason Krupp

Don Glory

Jacob Jones

Frank Green

Kyle Lamadeleine

Justin Falk

Stephen King

Denton Feather

Daniel Ingersoll

Brett Harrison

Joshua Castillo

Forrest Gielenz

Benjamin Ferber

Defendant

3M COMPANY

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob R Jagdfeld

Attorney at Johnson Becker PLLC

444 Cedar Street, Suite 1800

Saint Paul, MN 55101

Timothy J Becker

Attorney at Johnson Becker PLLC

444 Cedar St, Ste 1800

St. Paul, MN 55101

STACY KATHRYN HAUER

Attorney at JOHNSON BECKER PLLC - SAINT PAUL MN

444 Cedar Street, Suite 1800

Saint Paul, MN 55101

CRISTINA DELISE

Attorney at LANIER LAW FIRM - NEW YORK NY

126 E 56Th Street

New York, NY 10022

KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER

Attorney at LANIER LAW FIRM - HOUSTON TX

10940 W Sam Houston Pkwy North, Suite 100

Houston, TX 77069

MICHAEL A AKSELRUD

Attorney at LANIER LAW FIRM - WOODLAND HILLS CA

21550 Oxnard Street, Ste 3Rd Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

W MARK LANIER

Attorney at LANIER LAW FIRM - HOUSTON TX

10940 W Sam Houston Pkwy North, Suite 100

Houston, TX 77069

Defendant Attorneys

BENJAMIN W HULSE

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

S Jamal Faleel

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

JERRY W BLACKWELL

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

Other Attorneys

Faris Rashid

Attorney at Greene Espel PLLP

222 S. Ninth Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

#9

#8

#7

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on Aearo Technologies

1 #2

Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on 3M

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. KENNY COX, Joshua Castillo, Michael Cha, Joseph Cordova, Marcus Cosby, Eric Crane, Patrick Curry, Michael Dalton, James Daniel, Jason Daniels, Art Davenport, Patrick Davidson, Jon Davis, Clifford Dewitt, Kevin Dixon, Micheal Dugger, Thomas Dunlop, Zane Elliott, Iii, Brian Everitt, Justin Falk, Denton Feather, Benjamin Ferber, Thomas S Fertner, Jr, Raymond Flores, Kevin Frame, MICHAEL GREENE, BRANDON GREGORY, Forrest Gielenz, Don Glory, Frank Green, JOHN HARRISON, Brett Harrison, Nathanal Hart, Frederick Haslett, Jeremy Horinek, David Hunt, Daniel Ingersoll, Matthew Johnston, Jacob Jones, Jahbari Jones, Terwayne Jones, Brenr Kile, Stephen King, Marcus Kochanski, Daniel Krantz, Jason Krupp, Kyle Lamadeleine, ERIC CLARK and JASON CLIFTON terminated. (djb) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, KATHRYN) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by W MARK LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, W) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by CRISTINA DELISE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DELISE, CRISTINA) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A AKSELRUD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAUER, STACY) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02230. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • (#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT DUE TO CASE ASSIGNMENT ERROR. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois from the Civil (5th - Master) list. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2230 (JRT/LIB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (lmb) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (lmb). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • (#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2230 (PAM/HB). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing W. Mark Lanier; K. Rachal Lanier; Cristina Delise; Michael Akselrud as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second Judicial District, Ramsey County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7077170) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on 3M, #3 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on Aearo Technologies, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Faris Rashid