This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2021 at 09:07:46 (UTC).

Ledesma v. Fiesta Mart, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Ledesma filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Fiesta Mart, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02142

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clemencia Ledesma

Defendant

Fiesta Mart, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kiernan Angus McAlpine

Attorney at Daspit Law Firm

440 Louisiana, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Nathan Read Surprise

Attorney at Daspit Law Firm

440 Louisiana St, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

Wayne D Walters, III

Attorney at Ramsey & Murray PC

800 Gessner, Ste 250

Houston, TX 77024

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER to Report. By September 3, 2021, the parties must jointly report the status of this cae and the next steps to advance this litigation. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#7

(#7) MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Initial Conference held Appearances: Wayne D Walters, III, Kiernan Angus McAlpine. Ct Reporter: Malone. Order to be entered.(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#6

(#6) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Clemencia Ledesma, filed.(McAlpine, Kiernan) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#5

(#5) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Fiesta Mart, L.L.C., filed.(Walters, Wayne) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#4

(#4) DESIGNATION of Kiernan McAlpine as attorney in charge of Clemencia Ledesma, filed.(McAlpine, Kiernan) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#3

(#3) Order: Initial Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County, case number 2021-32811 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26680075) filed by Fiesta Mart, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walters, Wayne) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER to Report. By September 3, 2021, the parties must jointly report the status of this cae and the next steps to advance this litigation. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Initial Conference held Appearances: Wayne D Walters, III, Kiernan Angus McAlpine. Ct Reporter: Malone. Order to be entered.(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Clemencia Ledesma, filed.(McAlpine, Kiernan) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Fiesta Mart, L.L.C., filed.(Walters, Wayne) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DESIGNATION of Kiernan McAlpine as attorney in charge of Clemencia Ledesma, filed.(McAlpine, Kiernan) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order: Initial Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County, case number 2021-32811 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26680075) filed by Fiesta Mart, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walters, Wayne) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fiesta Mart, L.L.C. is a litigant