This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2021 at 09:30:56 (UTC).

Lederman v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Lederman filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02269

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Lederman

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sommer D. Luther

Attorney at Wagstaff Law Firm

940 North Lincoln Street

Denver, CO 80203

Defendant Attorney

Christopher J. Casolaro

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP-Denver

1144 Fifteenth Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 14 October 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension ofTime to Respond to Complaint (Dkt. #8 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer orotherwise respond to the Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) on or before October 22, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Casolaro, Christopher) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. Boston Scientific Corporation answer due 10/15/2021. (Casolaro, Christopher) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher J. Casolaro on behalf of Boston Scientific CorporationAttorney Christopher J. Casolaro added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft) (Casolaro, Christopher) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Lederman. All Defendants. (Luther, Sommer) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 23 August 2021. Consent Form due by 11/9/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/18/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8033004)Attorney Sommer D. Luther added to party Mary Lederman(pty:pla), filed by Mary Lederman.(Luther, Sommer) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 14 October 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension ofTime to Respond to Complaint (Dkt. #8 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer orotherwise respond to the Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) on or before October 22, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Casolaro, Christopher) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. Boston Scientific Corporation answer due 10/15/2021. (Casolaro, Christopher) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher J. Casolaro on behalf of Boston Scientific CorporationAttorney Christopher J. Casolaro added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft) (Casolaro, Christopher) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Lederman. All Defendants. (Luther, Sommer) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 23 August 2021. Consent Form due by 11/9/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/18/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8033004)Attorney Sommer D. Luther added to party Mary Lederman(pty:pla), filed by Mary Lederman.(Luther, Sommer) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant