This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/25/2022 at 08:21:13 (UTC).

LedComm LLC v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 LedComm LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00420

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LedComm LLC

Defendants

Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

Walgreen Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

501 Congress Ave, Suite 150

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15967036), filed by LedComm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#6

(#6) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LedComm LLC. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by LedComm LLC.(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Walgreen Co. (sv) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LedComm LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

11 #1

Proposed Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LedComm LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Walgreen Co. (sv) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by LedComm LLC.(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LedComm LLC. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15967036), filed by LedComm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LedComm LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreen Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond W Mort, III