This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2021 at 11:27:44 (UTC).

LedComm LLC v. Signify North America Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 LedComm LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Signify North America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01056

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LedComm LLC

Defendants

Signify N.V.

Signify North America Corporation

Signify Holding B.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Jae Y. Pak

Attorney at Lee Sullivan Shea & Smith LLP

656 W Randolph Street, Ste 5W

Chicago, IL 60607

David R. Grosby

Attorney at Lee Sullivan Shea & Smith LLP

656 W Randolph Street, Ste 5W

Chicago, IL 60607

Cole B. Richter

Attorney at Lee Sullivan Shea & Smith LLP

656 W Randolph Street, Ste 5W

Chicago, IL 60607

Defendant Attorney

Brady Randall Cox

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP - Dallas

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III for Cole B. Richter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14286800) on behalf of LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) Modified on 12/15/2020 (lad). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III for Jae Y. Pak ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14286795) on behalf of LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) Modified on 12/15/2020 (lad). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III for David R. Grosby ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14286785) on behalf of LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) Modified on 12/15/2020 (lad). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order for First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Signify North America Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14188429), filed by LedComm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cole B. Richter for LedComm LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jae Y. Pak for LedComm LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David R. Grosby for LedComm LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III for Cole B. Richter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14286800) on behalf of LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) Modified on 12/15/2020 (lad). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III for Jae Y. Pak ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14286795) on behalf of LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) Modified on 12/15/2020 (lad). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III for David R. Grosby ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14286785) on behalf of LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) Modified on 12/15/2020 (lad). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Signify Holding B.V., Signify N.V. and Signify North America Corporation answer due 3/10/2021. (lad) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Defendants' First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff LedComm, LLC's Complaint is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to March 10, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Signify Holding B.V., Signify N.V., Signify North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Cox, Brady) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Signify North America Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14188429), filed by LedComm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LedComm LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Signify Holding B.V. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brady R. Cox