This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2020 at 08:49:08 (UTC).

Ledcomm LLC v. Sengled Optoelectronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 Ledcomm LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sengled Optoelectronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark H. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00956

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ledcomm LLC

Defendants

Sengled Optoelectronics Co., Ltd.

Sengled USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven G. Hill

Attorney at Hill Kertscher & Wharton, LLP

3350 Riverwood Parkway, Suite 800

Atlanta, GA 30339

Martha Logan Decker

Attorney at Hill Kertscher & Wharton, LLP

3350 Riverwood Parkway, Suite 800

Atlanta, GA 30339

George I. Lee

Attorney at Lee, Sullivan, Shea & Smith LLP-IL

Suite 5W, 656 W Randolph St

Chicago, IL 60614

Jae Y. Pak

Attorney at Lee, Sullivan, Shea & Smith LLP-IL

Suite 5W, 656 W Randolph St

Chicago, IL 60614

David R. Grosby

Attorney at Lee, Sullivan, Shea & Smith LLP-IL

Suite 5W, 656 W Randolph St

Chicago, IL 60614

Michael Boyea

Attorney at Lee, Sullivan, Shea & Smith LLP-IL

Suite 5W, 656 W Randolph St

Chicago, IL 60614

Sean M. Sullivan

Attorney at Lee, Sullivan, Shea & Smith LLP-IL

Suite 5W, 656 W Randolph St

Chicago, IL 60614

Cole Richter

Attorney at Lee, Sullivan, Shea & Smith LLP-IL

Suite 5W, 656 W Randolph St

Chicago, IL 60614

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Sengled USA, Inc. Answer due 5/18/2020. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/16/2020. (jta) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Ledcomm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#15

(#15) Return of Service Executed by Ledcomm LLC. Sengled USA, Inc. served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#14

(#14) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#13

(#13) General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jta) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

4 #1

Summons Sengled USA

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Sengled Optoelectronics Co., Ltd. and Sengled USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Sengled USA)(ah) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#2

(#2) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ah) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ledcomm LLC. (ah) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Sengled USA, Inc. Answer due 5/18/2020. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/16/2020. (jta) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Sengled USA, Inc. Answer due 5/18/2020. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/16/2020. (jta) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Ledcomm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Return of Service Executed by Ledcomm LLC. Sengled USA, Inc. served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jta) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Boyea; GRANTING #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Grosby; GRANTING #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George Lee; GRANTING #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jae Y. Pak; GRANTING #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cole Richter; and GRANTING #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean M. Sullivan by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on March 11, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Sean M. Sullivan added appearing on behalf of Ledcomm LLC (nmb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Cole Richter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454417).. Attorney Cole Richter added appearing on behalf of Ledcomm LLC (nmb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Jae Y. Pak Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454405).. Attorney Jae Y. Pak added appearing on behalf of Ledcomm LLC (nmb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of George Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454389).. Attorney George I. Lee added appearing on behalf of Ledcomm LLC (nmb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION for Admission of Jae Y. Pak Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454405).by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of George Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454389).by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission of David R. Grosby Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454377).by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Boyea Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454363).by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission of Sean Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9448202).by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/3/2020. (jta) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Sengled Optoelectronics Co., Ltd. and Sengled USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Sengled USA)(ah) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ah) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ledcomm LLC. (ah) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ledcomm LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9434220). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LedComm LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SengLED USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George I. Lee(Designation Retained)