This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 09:31:56 (UTC).

LedComm LLC v. Anker Innovations Limited et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 LedComm LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Anker Innovations Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00421

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LedComm LLC

Defendants

Fantasia Trading LLC

Anker Innovations Limited

Fantasia Trading LLC doing business as AnkerDirect

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M Elizabeth Day

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich and Belloli LLP

577 Airport Boulevard Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Sean M Sullivan

Attorney at Lee Sullivan Shea and Smith LLP

656 West Randolph Street Suite 5W

Chicago, IL 60661

David R Grosby

Attorney at Lee Sullivan Shea and Smith LLP

656 West Randolph Street Floor 5W

Chicago, IL 60061

Jae Y Pak

Attorney at Lee Sullivan Shea and Smith LLP

656 West Randolph Street Suite 5W

Chicago, IL 60661

Michael P Boyea

Attorney at Lee Sullivan Shea and Smith LLP

656 West Randolph Street Suite 5W

Chicago, IL 60661

Steven A. Bowers

Attorney at Bowers IP Law PC

100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 700

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Marc C Belloli

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich and Belloli LLP

577 Airport Boulevard Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Cole B Richter

Attorney at Lee Sullivan Shea and Smith LLP

656 West Randolph Street Suite 5W

Chicago, IL 60661

George I Lee

Attorney at Lee Sullivan Shea and Smith LLP

656 West Randolph Street Suite 5W

Chicago, IL 60661

Sal Lim

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich and Belloli LLP

577 Airport Boulevard Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Defendant Attorney

Jason Xu

Attorney at White and Case LLP

701 Thirteenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #40 . Defendants Anker Innovations Limited answer due 6/23/2020; Fantasia Trading LLC answer due 6/23/2020. (twdb) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

40 #1

Proposed Order

#40

(#40) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 23, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belloli, Marc) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#39

(#39) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fantasia Trading LLC answer now due 4/24/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC.(Belloli, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#38

(#38) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#37

(#37) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:20-cv-00424 DOC(KESx). Case transferred from Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-00421 DOC(KESx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#36

(#36) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Sean M Sullivan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff LedComm LLC, designating Steven A Bowers as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

30 #1

Proposed Order

#30

(#36) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Sean M Sullivan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff LedComm LLC, designating Steven A Bowers as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by LedComm LLC. (Day, M) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#4

(#4) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Rule 7.1-1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC, (Day, M) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC. (Day, M) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC. (Day, M) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#39) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fantasia Trading LLC answer now due 4/24/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC.(Belloli, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #40 . Defendants Anker Innovations Limited answer due 6/23/2020; Fantasia Trading LLC answer due 6/23/2020. (twdb) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 23, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belloli, Marc) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fantasia Trading LLC answer now due 4/24/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC.(Belloli, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:20-cv-00424 DOC(KESx). Case transferred from Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-00421 DOC(KESx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Sean M Sullivan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff LedComm LLC, designating Steven A Bowers as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #29 Non-Resident Attorney Cole B Richter APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff LedComm LLC, designating Steven A Bowers as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney Jae Y Pak APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff LedComm LLC, designating Steven A Bowers as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #27 Non-Resident Attorney George I Lee APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff LedComm LLC, designating Steven A Bowers as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney David R Grosby APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff LedComm LLC, designating Steven A Bowers as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Sean M. Sullivan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney George I. Lee. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Anker Innovations Limited and Fantasia Trading LLC. (jtil) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by LedComm LLC. (Day, M) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Rule 7.1-1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC, (Day, M) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC. (Day, M) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC. (Day, M) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25578322 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff LedComm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney M Elizabeth Day added to party LedComm LLC (pty:pla))(Day, M) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fantasia Trading LLC doing business as AnkerDirect is a litigant

Latest cases where LedComm LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Anker Innovations Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Liang Xu