This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2023 at 08:26:15 (UTC).

LedComm LLC v. Ace Hardware Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 LedComm LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ace Hardware Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharon Johnson Coleman and Susan E. Cox. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-07063

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

Referral Judge

Susan E. Cox

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LedComm LLC

Defendant

Ace Hardware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond W. Mort, III

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

David Randolph Bennett

Attorney at Direction IP Law

P.O. Box 14184, 2620 N. Burling St.,

Chicago, IL 60614

Steven G Kalberg

Attorney at Direction IP Law

P.O. Box 14184

Chicago, IL 60614

Defendant Attorneys

Theresa L. Starck

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff LLP

71 South Wacker Drive, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60606

Eric J. Maiers

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Matthew Joshua Levinstein

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig Llp

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's joint motion to dismiss without prejudice #37 is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice and all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be bornbe by the incurring party. Status hearing set for 3/29/2023 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Motion by David Randolph Bennett for presentment of (Bennett, David) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#37

(#37) MOTION by Plaintiff LedComm LLC to dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice (Bennett, David) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#36

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's joint motion to stay proceedings and extend deadlines #34 is granted. The parties Rule 26(f) conference report to be filed by 2/23/2023. Defendant to file a responsive pleading by 3/1/2023. Rule 26(a) disclosures to be submitted by 3/15/2023. The in-person status hearing set for 2/22/2023 is stricken and reset to 3/29/2023 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Maiers for presentment of (Maiers, Eric) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#34

(#34) MOTION by Defendant Ace Hardware Corporation to stay Stay Proceedings and Extend Deadlines [Joint] (Maiers, Eric) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#33

(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: This case has been referred to Judge Cox for discovery supervision. The parties are ordered to review Judge Cox's case procedures and familiarize themselves with them. The parties are ordered to file a Rule 26(f) conference report on or before 1/19/23. A template for the report can be found on Judge Cox's website. (rbf, ) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#32

(#32) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Susan E. Cox for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#31

(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 1/4/2023. Counsel for plaintiff did not appear but later contacted the Court apologizing for not appearing. Defendant to file a responsive pleading by 1/25/2023. Rule 26(a) disclosures to be submitted by 2/8/2023. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cox for discovery supervision. An in-person status hearing is set for 2/22/2023 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph William Shaneyfelt on behalf of Ace Hardware Corporation. Attorney Joseph William Shaneyfelt added to party Ace Hardware Corporation(pty:dft) (Shaneyfelt, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LedComm LLC. Ace Hardware Corporation served on 4/29/2002, answer due 5/20/2002. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Ace Hardware Corporation. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's joint motion to dismiss without prejudice #37 is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice and all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be bornbe by the incurring party. Status hearing set for 3/29/2023 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Motion by David Randolph Bennett for presentment of (Bennett, David) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION by Plaintiff LedComm LLC to dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice (Bennett, David) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's joint motion to stay proceedings and extend deadlines #34 is granted. The parties Rule 26(f) conference report to be filed by 2/23/2023. Defendant to file a responsive pleading by 3/1/2023. Rule 26(a) disclosures to be submitted by 3/15/2023. The in-person status hearing set for 2/22/2023 is stricken and reset to 3/29/2023 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Maiers for presentment of (Maiers, Eric) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION by Defendant Ace Hardware Corporation to stay Stay Proceedings and Extend Deadlines [Joint] (Maiers, Eric) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: This case has been referred to Judge Cox for discovery supervision. The parties are ordered to review Judge Cox's case procedures and familiarize themselves with them. The parties are ordered to file a Rule 26(f) conference report on or before 1/19/23. A template for the report can be found on Judge Cox's website. (rbf, ) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Susan E. Cox for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 1/4/2023. Counsel for plaintiff did not appear but later contacted the Court apologizing for not appearing. Defendant to file a responsive pleading by 1/25/2023. Rule 26(a) disclosures to be submitted by 2/8/2023. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cox for discovery supervision. An in-person status hearing is set for 2/22/2023 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by LedComm LLC (Bennett, David) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Withdraw 7 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against Ace Hardware Corporation by LedComm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph William Shaneyfelt on behalf of Ace Hardware Corporation. Attorney Joseph William Shaneyfelt added to party Ace Hardware Corporation(pty:dft) (Shaneyfelt, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LedComm LLC. Ace Hardware Corporation served on 4/29/2002, answer due 5/20/2002. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Ace Hardware Corporation. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15967075), filed by LedComm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/15/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less