This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2020 at 08:05:40 (UTC).

Ledbetter v. Juul Labs Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Ledbetter filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John E Ott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Ott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rebecca Ledbetter

Defendants

Juul Labs Inc

Altria Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A Powell

Attorney at HARE WYNN NEWELL & NEWTON

2025 3Rd Avenue North, Suite 800

Birmingham, AL 35203-3331

Tempe Dorinda Smith

Attorney at HARE WYNN NEWALL & NEWTON

2025 Third Avenue North, Ste. 800

Birmingham, AL 35203

Bruce J McKee

Attorney at HARE WYNN NEWELL & NEWTON

2025 3Rd Avenue, North, Suite 800

Birmingham, AL 35203-3331

Donald P McKenna, Jr

Attorney at HARE WYNN NEWELL & NEWTON LLP

2025 Third Avenue North, Suite 800

Birmingham, AL 35203-3331

Christopher S Randolph, Jr

Attorney at HARE WYNN NEWELL & NEWTON

2025 Third Avenue North Suite 800

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Austin V. Schwing

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

555 Mission Street, Ste. 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jeffrey P Doss

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Lana Alcorn Olson

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

The Clark Building, 400 20Th Street N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Christopher C Yearout

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

William H Brooks

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

Lisa Jane McCrary

Attorney at BARZE, TAYLOR, NOLES, LOWTHER LLC

2204 Lakeshore Drive, Ste. 330

Birmingham, AL 35209

R Bruce Barze, Jr

Attorney at BARZE TAYLOR NOLES LOWTHER LLC

2204 Lakeshore Drive, Suite 330

Birmingham, AL 35209

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit Ex A

3 #2

Exhibit Ex B

3 #3

Exhibit Ex C

3 #4

Exhibit Ex D

#4

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern California for inclusion in MDL 2913; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Northern California. (KAM) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER granting #3 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Determination. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 1/10/2020. (SJB) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Altria Group Inc. filed by Altria Group Inc (Barze, R) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Transfer by Juul Labs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Exhibit Ex C, #4 Exhibit Ex D)(Brooks, William) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Juul Labs Inc. filed by Juul Labs Inc (Brooks, William) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3510939. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Juul Labs Inc, Altria Group Inc from Jefferson County Circuit Court Bessemer Division, case number 68-cv-2019-901030., filed by Juul Labs Inc, Altria Group Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KAM). (Brooks, William) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Juul Labs Inc, Altria Group Inc from Jefferson County Circuit Court Bessemer Division, case number 68-cv-2019-901030., filed by Juul Labs Inc, Altria Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Altria Group, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where JUUL Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Austin V. Schwing

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Haynes Brooks