This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2022 at 09:19:15 (UTC).

LED Wafer Solutions LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 LED Wafer Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Vince Chhabria and Lisa J. Cisneros. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-04809

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

Referral Judge

Lisa J. Cisneros

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LED Wafer Solutions LLC

Defendants

Samsung Electronics Co Ltd

Samsung Electronics America Inc

Seoul Semiconductor Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott W. Breedlove

Theresa M. Dawson

E. Leon Carter

Bradley David Liddle

Daniel L. Schmid

Erick Scott Robinson

Joshua J. Bennett

Charles Wizenfeld

Michael C. Pomeroy

Nathan I. Cox

Defendant Attorneys

Yung-Hoon Ha

Benjamin Norenberg Luehrs

Cosmin Maier

Jordan Owens

Taeg Sang Cho

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#138

(#138) ORDER REFERRING CASE to a randomly Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/20/2022. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2022) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

137 #2

Exhibit 1

137 #1

Declaration of David J. Cho In Support of Stipulated Motion for Entry of Stipula

137 #137

Main Document

#136

(#136) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Maier, Cosmin) (Filed on 10/19/2022) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#135

(#135) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #134 Stipulation re Proposed Schedule. Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2022. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2023 01:00 PM via Zoom. Close of Fact Discovery on 9/8/2023. Close of Expert Discovery on 1/29/2024. Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion due by 3/14/2024. Daubert Motions due by 3/14/2024. Defendant's Dispositive Motion due by 4/11/2024. Daubert Motions and Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 6/6/2024 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2022) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#134

(#134) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Case Schedule filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Maier, Cosmin) (Filed on 10/12/2022) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#132

(#132) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Daniel L. Schmid ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17596441.) filed by LED Wafer Solutions LLC. (Schmid, Daniel) (Filed on 10/5/2022) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#131

(#131) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Cho, David) (Filed on 10/5/2022) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (lad) (lad). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LED Wafer Solutions LLC. (Carter, E.) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Carter, E.) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/26/2021) (lad). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

188 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros for Discovery (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2022) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) ORDER REFERRING CASE to a randomly Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/20/2022. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2022) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Cho In Support of Stipulated Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Maier, Cosmin) (Filed on 10/19/2022) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Maier, Cosmin) (Filed on 10/19/2022) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #134 Stipulation re Proposed Schedule. Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2022. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2023 01:00 PM via Zoom. Close of Fact Discovery on 9/8/2023. Close of Expert Discovery on 1/29/2024. Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion due by 3/14/2024. Daubert Motions due by 3/14/2024. Defendant's Dispositive Motion due by 4/11/2024. Daubert Motions and Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 6/6/2024 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2022) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Case Schedule filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Maier, Cosmin) (Filed on 10/12/2022) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Docket(#133) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 10/5/2022.The parties all declined to consent to Magistrate jurisdiction.The parties are ordered to file a joint proposed schedule on the docket within 7 days, which culminates in the following dates: Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2024, 10:00 AM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Jury Trial set for 10/7/2024, 10:00 AM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 2:04 - 2:11. Plaintiff Attorney: Bradley Liddle, Michael Pomeroy, Daniel Schmid, Theresa Dawson, and Michael Amberg. Defendant Attorney: Taeg Cho, David Cho, Frederick Ding, and Cosmin Maier for Samsung; Michael Eisenberg and Ashwin Ram for Seoul Semiconductor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2022) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Daniel L. Schmid ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17596441.) filed by LED Wafer Solutions LLC. (Schmid, Daniel) (Filed on 10/5/2022) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Cho, David) (Filed on 10/5/2022) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Cho, David) (Filed on 10/5/2022) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LED Wafer Solutions LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. (Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Brian) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LED Wafer Solutions LLC. (Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (lad) (lad). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LED Wafer Solutions LLC. (Carter, E.) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Carter, E.) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/26/2021) (lad). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14631032), filed by LED Wafer Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carter, E.) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less