This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2021 at 21:42:59 (UTC).

Lechter et al v. Aprio, LLP et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Lechter filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Aprio, LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01325

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Russell Dalba

Kathryn Dalba

Sylvia Thompson

Andrew Lechter

Lawson F. Thompson

Defendants

Aprio, LLP

James Jowers

Robert Greenberger

Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.

Forever Forests LLC

Large & Gilbert, Inc.

Jim R. Clower, Sr.

Burr & Forman, LLP

Smith, Lewis & Haley, LLP

Nancy Zak

Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.

Robert D. Keller

Sirote & Permutt, P.C.

Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc.

Clower Kirsch & Associates, LLC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeven R. Sloan

Attorney at Loewinsohn Deary Simon Ray LLP

12377 Merit Drive, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75251

Edward Jon Rappaport

Attorney at Saylor Law Firm LLP

1201 W Peachtree Street, Suite 3220

Atlanta, GA 30309

Jim L. Flegle

Attorney at Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon LLP

12377 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

William Ralph Canada, Jr.

Attorney at Loewinsohn Deary Simon Ray LLP

12377 Merit Drive, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75251

David R. Deary

Attorney at Loewinsohn Deary Simon Ray LLP

12377 Merit Drive, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75251

Donna Lee

Attorney at Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon LLP

12377 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

Tyler McLean Simpson

Attorney at Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon LLP

12377 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

John William McKenzie, III

Attorney at Loewinsohn Deary Simon Ray LLP

12377 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

Wilson Edward Wray, Jr.

Attorney at Loewinsohn Deary Simon Ray LLP

12377 Merit Drive, Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendant Attorneys

John H. Rains, IV

Attorney at Bondurant Mixson & Elmore, LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street, N.W., 3900 One Atlantic Center

Atlanta, GA 30309-3417

Jennifer Peterson

Attorney at Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street Nw, Suite 3900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Anthony Joseph Rollins

Attorney at Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1105 W. Peachtree Street N. W., Suite 1000

Atlanta, GA 30309

Colin Dang Delaney

Attorney at Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1105 W. Peachtree Street N. W., Suite 1000

Atlanta, GA 30309

Steven Anthony Vickery

Attorney at Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1105 W. Peachtree Street N. W., Suite 1000

Atlanta, GA 30309

Gregory Keith Smith

Attorney at Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1105 W. Peachtree Street N. W., Suite 1000

Atlanta, GA 30309

Tala Amirfazli

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP-ATL

Suite 1100, 171 17Th St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30363

Sam Berry Blair

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz-Memphis

165 Madison Avenue, 2000 First Tennessee Building

Memphis, TN 38103

Ryan Andrew Strain

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC-TN

Suite 2000, 165 Madison Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Steven G. Hall

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.-Atl

Suite 1600, Monarch Plaza, 3414 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-1164

Other Attorneys

Andre Townsend Tennille, III

Tennille Pc, 1266 West Paces Ferry Road N.W., Ste #173

Atlanta, GA 30327

28 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#258

(#258) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Status Conference held on 11/4/2021. The Court held a case management conference with counsel on this date. As a result of this conference, the following directives and oral orders were issued. Defendants are directed to provide the Court with bullet points and authorities in support of their Class Action Fairness Act arguments by November 8, 2021. The parties are directed to provide the Court with a Joint Case Management Plan by November 17, 2021. If this November 17th date proves not feasible due to ongoing discussions between the parties, the parties are directed to advise the Court by November 15th of their inability to conclude the Case Management Plan by that deadline and of the date by which the Proposed Joint Case Management Plan will be submitted. Defendants deadline to Answer the Amended Complaint is extended to November 30, 2021. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(vs) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

257 #1

Exhibit 1

#257

(#257) RESPONSE in Opposition re #252 MOTION for Sanctions of Baker Donelson filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#256

(#256) RESPONSE re #255 Notice of Filing Proposed Case Management Order filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Wray, Wilson) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

255 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#255

(#255) NOTICE Of Filing [Proposed] Case Management Order by Aprio, LLP, Robert Greenberger (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rains, John) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#254

(#254) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response re: #252 MOTION for Sanctions by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

252 #1

Memorandum of Law

#252

(#252) MOTION for Rule 11 Sanctions by Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(hfm) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

404 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#258) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Status Conference held on 11/4/2021. The Court held a case management conference with counsel on this date. As a result of this conference, the following directives and oral orders were issued. Defendants are directed to provide the Court with bullet points and authorities in support of their Class Action Fairness Act arguments by November 8, 2021. The parties are directed to provide the Court with a Joint Case Management Plan by November 17, 2021. If this November 17th date proves not feasible due to ongoing discussions between the parties, the parties are directed to advise the Court by November 15th of their inability to conclude the Case Management Plan by that deadline and of the date by which the Proposed Joint Case Management Plan will be submitted. Defendants deadline to Answer the Amended Complaint is extended to November 30, 2021. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(vs) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#257) RESPONSE in Opposition re #252 MOTION for Sanctions of Baker Donelson filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#256) RESPONSE re #255 Notice of Filing Proposed Case Management Order filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Wray, Wilson) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#255) NOTICE Of Filing [Proposed] Case Management Order by Aprio, LLP, Robert Greenberger (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rains, John) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #254 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including November 2, 2021, to file a response re #252 MOTION for Sanctions. Entered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/21/21. (hfm) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#254) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response re: #252 MOTION for Sanctions by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#253) NOTICE by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson of Firm Name Change (Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, re #252 MOTION for Rule 11 Sanctions filed by Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C. The briefing schedule for response and reply briefs are as outlined within the Court's local rules. Plaintiff shall be allowed thirty-five (35) pages for the response brief and BDBC&B shall be limited to the the standard fifteen (15) pages allowed for a reply brief. Entered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/12/21. (hfm) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#252) MOTION for Rule 11 Sanctions by Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(hfm) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#251) NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions and Request for Direction by Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 07/10/2020 Rule 11 Documents)(Blair, Sam) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
279 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler Simpson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540140).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission of Donna Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540099).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission of John McKenzie Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540076).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission of Jim L. Flegle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540047).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION for Admission of William Ralph Canada, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540017).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Admission of David R. Deary Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9539817).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/30/2020. (jed) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jap) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Andrew Lechter, Sylvia Thompson, Lawson F. Thompson, Russell Dalba, and Kathryn Dalba. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9526647). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Burr & Forman, LLP is a litigant