This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:12:28 (UTC).

Lechner v. DuPage County Sheriff Office et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Lechner filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DuPage County Sheriff Office. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07945

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane M. Lechner

Defendants

DuPage County Sheriff's Office

DuPage County

DuPage County Sheriff Office

County of DuPage

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Don Milner Sowers

Attorney at Law Office of Daniel E. Goodman, LLC

10400 W. Higgins Rd, Ste. 500

Rosemont, IL 60018

Defendant Attorneys

Trevor Michael Jordan Prindle

Attorney at Dupage County State's Attorney's Office

503 N County Farm Road

Wheaton, IL 60187

Lisa Ann Smith

Attorney at DuPage County State's Attorney's Office

503 N. County Farm Road

Wheaton, IL 60187

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Initial Status Report outline

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Defendant's motion to dismiss #6 is entered and continued 2/6/2020 at 9:15 a.m. The motion hearing set for 1/30/2020 is stricken. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 2/3/2020. The Court will hold a status hearing on 2/6/2020 at 9:15 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Motion by Lisa Ann Smith for presentment of motion to dismiss #6 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 1/30/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Smith, Lisa) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Defendants DuPage County Sheriff Office, County of DuPage to dismiss (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint at Law Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure) (Smith, Lisa) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants County of DuPage, DuPage County Sheriff Office by Trevor Michael Jordan Prindle (Prindle, Trevor) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants County of DuPage, DuPage County Sheriff Office by Lisa Ann Smith (Smith, Lisa) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Diane M. Lechner by Don Milner Sowers (Sowers, Don) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sowers, Don) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Diane M. Lechner; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16498961.(Sowers, Don) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Defendant's motion to dismiss #6 is entered and continued 2/6/2020 at 9:15 a.m. The motion hearing set for 1/30/2020 is stricken. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 2/3/2020. The Court will hold a status hearing on 2/6/2020 at 9:15 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Motion by Lisa Ann Smith for presentment of motion to dismiss #6 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 1/30/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Smith, Lisa) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Defendants DuPage County Sheriff Office, County of DuPage to dismiss (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint at Law Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure) (Smith, Lisa) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants County of DuPage, DuPage County Sheriff Office by Trevor Michael Jordan Prindle (Prindle, Trevor) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants County of DuPage, DuPage County Sheriff Office by Lisa Ann Smith (Smith, Lisa) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants County of DuPage, DuPage County Sheriff Office (jp, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Diane M. Lechner by Don Milner Sowers (Sowers, Don) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sowers, Don) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Diane M. Lechner; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16498961.(Sowers, Don) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.