This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2019 at 08:43:34 (UTC).

Lebrun v. Kansas City Southern Railway Co

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 Lebrun filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against Kansas City Southern Railway Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and Donald E Walter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01379

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

Donald E Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory Lebrun

Defendant

Kansas City Southern Railroad Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Francis Winocour

Attorney at Winocour Law

1511 E Levee St Ste B

Dallas, TX 75207

Mike C Miller

Attorney at Law Office of Mike C Miller

201 W Houst St

Marshall, TX 75670

Bennett L Politz

Attorney at Booth Lockard et al

920 Pierremont Rd Ste 104

Shreveport, LA 71106

Defendant Attorneys

Paul O Wickes

Attorney at Wickes Law

1445 Ross Ave Ste 3700

Dallas, TX 75202

Gemma Zuniga

Attorney at Wilkinson Carmody & Gilliam

P O Box 1707

Shreveport, LA 71166

Paul Michael Davis, Jr

Attorney at Wilkinson Carmody & Gilliam

P O Box 1707

Shreveport, LA 71166

Bobby S Gilliam

Attorney at Wilkinson Carmody & Gilliam

P O Box 1707

Shreveport, LA 71166

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) MEMORANDUM ORDER: All requirements of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) are hereby waived in this case, including the conference of the parties and the report to the Court. The parties are directed to serve their initial disclosures within 15 days and promptly begin any necessary discovery and motion practice. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 12/2/2019. (crt,Bray, K) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#46

(#46) ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jonathan Francis Winocour for Gregory Lebrun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/19/2019. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#45

(#45) ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mike C Miller for Gregory Lebrun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/19/2019. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#44

(#44) PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Lebrun. (aty,Politz, Bennett) Modified to add a docket entry relationship on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#43

(#43) PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Lebrun. (aty,Politz, Bennett) Modified to add docket entry relationship on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Deficiency to Bennett L Politz on behalf of Gregory Lebrun regarding #40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #41 First MOTION for Mike Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4110180). Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#41

(#41) MOTION for Mike Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4110180) by Gregory Lebrun. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (aty,Politz, Bennett) Modified to reflect deficient status on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #44 for proposed order. (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#40

(#40) MOTION for Jonathan Winocour to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4110123) with consent (amended to include local counsel signature) by Gregory Lebrun. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (aty,Politz, Bennett) Modified event to more accurately describe document and to reflect deficient status on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #43 for Proposed Order. (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#39

(#39) DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY - First MOTION for Jonathan Winocour to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4110123) by Gregory Lebrun. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attorney Bennett L Politz added to party Gregory Lebrun(pty:pla))(aty,Politz, Bennett) Modified to reflect resubmitted on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #4 . (Entered: 11/18/2019)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) ***FILED IN ERROR***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kansas City Southern Railway Company.( Wickes, Paul) Modified on 3/28/2019 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#4

(#39) DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY - First MOTION for Jonathan Winocour to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4110123) by Gregory Lebrun. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attorney Bennett L Politz added to party Gregory Lebrun(pty:pla))(aty,Politz, Bennett) Modified to reflect resubmitted on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #4 . (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Kansas City Southern Railway Company by and through its registered agent for service of process in Texas: CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/05/2019)

1 #3

Revised Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons(es) Summons in a Civil Action

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Plaintiff's Original) against Kansas City Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7166303.), filed by Gregory Lebrun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es) Summons in a Civil Action)(Winocour, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2019: #3 Revised Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/05/2019)

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) MEMORANDUM ORDER: All requirements of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) are hereby waived in this case, including the conference of the parties and the report to the Court. The parties are directed to serve their initial disclosures within 15 days and promptly begin any necessary discovery and motion practice. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 12/2/2019. (crt,Bray, K) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jonathan Francis Winocour for Gregory Lebrun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/19/2019. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mike C Miller for Gregory Lebrun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/19/2019. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Lebrun. (aty,Politz, Bennett) Modified to add a docket entry relationship on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Lebrun. (aty,Politz, Bennett) Modified to add docket entry relationship on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE of Deficiency to Bennett L Politz on behalf of Gregory Lebrun regarding #40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #41 First MOTION for Mike Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4110180). Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MOTION for Mike Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4110180) by Gregory Lebrun. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (aty,Politz, Bennett) Modified to reflect deficient status on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #44 for proposed order. (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION for Jonathan Winocour to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4110123) with consent (amended to include local counsel signature) by Gregory Lebrun. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (aty,Politz, Bennett) Modified event to more accurately describe document and to reflect deficient status on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #43 for Proposed Order. (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY - First MOTION for Jonathan Winocour to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4110123) by Gregory Lebrun. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attorney Bennett L Politz added to party Gregory Lebrun(pty:pla))(aty,Politz, Bennett) Modified to reflect resubmitted on 11/18/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #4 . (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Paul O Wickes for Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/15/2019. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kansas City Southern Railway Company.( Wickes, Paul) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE USE THE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION Document # 5, Unopposed Application for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ***FILED IN ERROR***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kansas City Southern Railway Company.( Wickes, Paul) Modified on 3/28/2019 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Lebrun. Kansas City Southern Railway Company served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Winocour, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Kansas City Southern Railway Company by and through its registered agent for service of process in Texas: CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/20/2019. (klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Plaintiff's Original) against Kansas City Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7166303.), filed by Gregory Lebrun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es) Summons in a Civil Action)(Winocour, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2019: #3 Revised Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less