This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 10:56:58 (UTC).

LeBouef v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 LeBouef filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00814

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Denese LeBouef

Defendants

GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company

GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roger Glenn Burgess

Attorney at Baggett McCall et al

P O Drawer 7820

Lake Charles, LA 70606-7820

Defendant Attorneys

Simeon B Reimonenq, Jr

Attorney at Lugenbuhl Wheaton et al (NO)

601 Poydras St Ste 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Seth A Schmeeckle

Attorney at Lugenbuhl Wheaton et al (NO)

601 Poydras St Ste 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 14th Judicial District Court for Calcasieu Parish. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/27/2020. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

10 #2

Proposed order

10 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand by Denese LeBouef. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Burgess, Roger) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) STIPULATION by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co, Denese LeBouef. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified on 7/23/2020 to add filer (Jones, P). (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#8

(#8) ISSUED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Deficiency to Simeon B Reimonenq, Jr on behalf of GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co regarding #6 Amended Answer to Complaint. Reason: Leave of court is required for the filing of this supplemental pleading. Please refer to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(d) regarding supplemental pleadings for additional information. (crt,Jones, P) Modified on 7/8/2020 to indicate issued in error (Jones, P). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent GeoVera Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent GeoVera Insurance Holdings, Ltd. for GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#6

(#6) AMENDED ANSWER to Petition for Breach of Contract, Bad Faith, Penalties and Attorney's Fees #1 Notice of Removal, by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified on 7/8/2020 to indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 7/8/2020 to remove deficiency (Jones, P). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#4

(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/29/2020. (crt,LaCombe, L) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

1 #5

Civil cover sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Listing

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Notice

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Record

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2020-1116 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4304747) filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Listing, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Simeon B Reimonenq, Jr added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 14th Judicial District Court for Calcasieu Parish. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/27/2020. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #10 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand by Denese LeBouef. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Burgess, Roger) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co, Denese LeBouef. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified on 7/23/2020 to add filer (Jones, P). (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ISSUED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Deficiency to Simeon B Reimonenq, Jr on behalf of GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co regarding #6 Amended Answer to Complaint. Reason: Leave of court is required for the filing of this supplemental pleading. Please refer to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(d) regarding supplemental pleadings for additional information. (crt,Jones, P) Modified on 7/8/2020 to indicate issued in error (Jones, P). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent GeoVera Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent GeoVera Insurance Holdings, Ltd. for GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED ANSWER to Petition for Breach of Contract, Bad Faith, Penalties and Attorney's Fees #1 Notice of Removal, by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified on 7/8/2020 to indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 7/8/2020 to remove deficiency (Jones, P). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/29/2020. (crt,LaCombe, L) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/26/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Simeon B Reimonenq, Jr, Seth A Schmeeckle on behalf of GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/10/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company answer due 7/2/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2020-1116 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4304747) filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Listing, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Simeon B Reimonenq, Jr added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Reimonenq, Simeon) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less