This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2022 at 05:22:27 (UTC).

LeBeau v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 LeBeau filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03557

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gayle LeBeau

Paula Lebeau

Crytstal Lebeau Islam

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Eagle Inc.

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

McCarty Corporation

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Hopeman Brothers, Inc.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

International Paper Company

Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company

CBS Corporation

Lamorak Insurance Company

The Travelers Insurance Company

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Eagle Inc.

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

McCarty Corporation

Hopeman Brothers, Inc.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

International Paper Company

Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company

CBS Corporation

General Electric Company

Bayer Cropscience Inc.

Foster Wheeler LLC

Uniroyal, Inc.

The Manville Personal Injury Trust

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

43 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Joinder. Hopeman Brothers joins and adopts the arguments set forth in Huntington Ingalls Inc's #9 memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/15/2022. (jls) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

13 #7

Proposed Order

13 #6

Exhibit C

13 #5

Exhibit B

9 #23

Exhibit U

9 #22

Exhibit T

9 #20

Exhibit R

9 #18

Exhibit P

9 #16

Exhibit N

9 #15

Exhibit M - PART 2

9 #13

Exhibit L

9 #12

Exhibit K

9 #10

Exhibit I

9 #6

Exhibit E

9 #4

Exhibit C

9 #2

Exhibit B- Part 1

9 #1

Exhibit A

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Joinder. Hopeman Brothers joins and adopts the arguments set forth in Huntington Ingalls Inc's #9 memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/15/2022. (jls) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Joinder re #9 Huntington Ingalls Incs memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/15/2022. (jls) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Joinder in Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Opposition (R. Doc. 9) to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 8) by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (1 of 3), #3 Exhibit A (2 of 3), #4 Exhibit A (3 of 3), #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Proposed Order)(Semmes, Mathilde) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Joinder as to Avondale's Opposition, rec. doc. 9, by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Logan, James) Modified text on 11/14/2022 (jls). (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Logan, James) Modified text on 11/15/2022 (jls). (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Original and First Supplemental Petition by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London.(Logan, James) Modified text on 11/14/2022 (jls). (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B- Part 1, #3 Exhibit B- Part 2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M - PART 1, #15 Exhibit M - PART 2, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Crystal LeBeau Islam, Gayle J. LeBeau, Paula Lebeau. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Notice of Submission, #7 Proposed Order)(Doody, Spencer) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Jane Triche Milazzo RECUSED. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/19/2022. (NEF: Section G) (sa) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/6/2022. (sa) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Amanda C. Fraser by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5, #6 Exhibit A - Part 6, #7 Exhibit A - Part 7)(Melancon, David) Modified on 10/18/2022 (sa). (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(js) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (mb) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 19-11819 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9580147) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/30/2022) (my). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/30/2022) (my). Modified text on 9/30/2022 (js). (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lamorak Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where Eagle Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS INSURANCE is a litigant