This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2021 at 08:28:12 (UTC).

Leatherman v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Leatherman filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against CoreCivic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy D. DeGiusti and Gary M. Purcell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00672

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

Referral Judge

Gary M. Purcell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chad Edward Leatherman

Defendants

CoreCivic Inc

John Doe

Michael Sizemore

Stephen Paine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dustin J Vanderhoof

Attorney at Smolen Law PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Laura L Hamilton

Attorney at Smolen Law PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Hunter K Bailey

Attorney at Smolen Law PLLC

John Warren

Attorney at LEAD ATTORNEY

Donald E Smolen, II

Attorney at Smolen Law PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Lawrence R Murphy, Jr

Attorney at Smolen Law PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorney

Darrell L Moore

Attorney at J Ralph Moore PC

P O Box 368

Pryor, OK 74362

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Edward Leatherman. Stephen Paine served on 7/27/2021. (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#31

(#31) ANSWER to Complaint by Stephen Paine.(Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#30

(#30) ENTRY of Appearance by Darrell L Moore on behalf of Stephen Paine (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#29

(#29) Summons Issued Electronically as to Stephen Paine. (kmt) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#28

(#28) ENTER ORDER. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time to serve Defendant Paine. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall serve Defendant Paine no later than September 7, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 7/9/2021. (cps) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#27

(#27) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Chad Edward Leatherman. (Vanderhoof, Dustin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#26

(#26) ENTRY of Appearance by Darrell L Moore on behalf of CoreCivic Inc, Michael Sizemore (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#25

(#25) ENTRY of Appearance by Dustin J Vanderhoof on behalf of Chad Edward Leatherman (Vanderhoof, Dustin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#24

(#24) ENTRY of Appearance by Lawrence R Murphy, Jr on behalf of Chad Edward Leatherman (Murphy, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore (Moore, Darrell) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CoreCivic, Inc. (Moore, Darrell) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District and Brief in Support by CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore (Moore, Darrell) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrell Lee Moore on behalf of CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore [Note: Attorney Darrell Lee Moore added to party CoreCivic, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Darrell Lee Moore added to party Michael Sizemore(pty:dft).] (Moore, Darrell) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Michael Sizemore (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CoreCivic, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CoreCivic, Inc., Stephen Paine, Michael Sizemore (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#2

(#10) ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore (Moore, Darrell) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 02/16/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Edward Leatherman. Stephen Paine served on 7/27/2021. (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to Complaint by Stephen Paine.(Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ENTRY of Appearance by Darrell L Moore on behalf of Stephen Paine (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Summons Issued Electronically as to Stephen Paine. (kmt) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ENTER ORDER. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time to serve Defendant Paine. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall serve Defendant Paine no later than September 7, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 7/9/2021. (cps) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Chad Edward Leatherman. (Vanderhoof, Dustin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ENTRY of Appearance by Darrell L Moore on behalf of CoreCivic Inc, Michael Sizemore (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ENTRY of Appearance by Dustin J Vanderhoof on behalf of Chad Edward Leatherman (Vanderhoof, Dustin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ENTRY of Appearance by Lawrence R Murphy, Jr on behalf of Chad Edward Leatherman (Murphy, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ENTRY of Appearance by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of Chad Edward Leatherman (Hamilton, Laura) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore (Moore, Darrell) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CoreCivic, Inc. (Moore, Darrell) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing CoreCivic, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District and Brief in Support by CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore (Moore, Darrell) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrell Lee Moore on behalf of CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore [Note: Attorney Darrell Lee Moore added to party CoreCivic, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Darrell Lee Moore added to party Michael Sizemore(pty:dft).] (Moore, Darrell) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Michael Sizemore (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CoreCivic, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CoreCivic, Inc., Stephen Paine, Michael Sizemore (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CoreCivic, Inc., John Doe, Stephen Paine, Michael Sizemore (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2355054) by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/2/2021.] (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CoreCivic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dustin Vanderhoof

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr