This case was last updated from PACER on 04/17/2021 at 11:35:52 (UTC).

Leatherman v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Leatherman filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against CoreCivic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory K Frizzell and Jodi F Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00065

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory K Frizzell

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chad Edward Leatherman

Defendants

CoreCivic, Inc.

John Doe

Michael Sizemore

Stephen Paine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura L Hamilton

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Hunter Keith Bailey

Attorney at Smolen Law

611 S. Detroit Ave.

Tulsa, OK 74120

Donald Eugene Smolen, II

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

John William Warren

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorney

Darrell Lee Moore

Attorney at J Ralph Moore P C

P O Box 368

Pryor, OK 74362

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CoreCivic, Inc. (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District and Brief in Support by CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrell Lee Moore on behalf of CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore [Note: Attorney Darrell Lee Moore added to party CoreCivic, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Darrell Lee Moore added to party Michael Sizemore(pty:dft).] (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Michael Sizemore (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CoreCivic, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CoreCivic, Inc., Stephen Paine, Michael Sizemore (ll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CoreCivic, Inc., John Doe, Stephen Paine, Michael Sizemore (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2355054) by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case until resolution of the Motion to Transfer filed by Defendants CoreCivic and Michael Sizemore. (Re: #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District and Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CoreCivic, Inc. (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing CoreCivic, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District and Brief in Support by CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrell Lee Moore on behalf of CoreCivic, Inc., Michael Sizemore [Note: Attorney Darrell Lee Moore added to party CoreCivic, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Darrell Lee Moore added to party Michael Sizemore(pty:dft).] (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Michael Sizemore (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CoreCivic, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CoreCivic, Inc., Stephen Paine, Michael Sizemore (ll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CoreCivic, Inc., John Doe, Stephen Paine, Michael Sizemore (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2355054) by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chad Edward Leatherman (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CoreCivic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John William Warren

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura L Hamilton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald Eugene Smolen, II