This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2021 at 08:08:40 (UTC).

Leasepoint Funding Group, LLC v. Osteoporosis & Rheumatology Center of Tampa Bay, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Leasepoint Funding Group, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Osteoporosis Rheumatology Center of Tampa Bay, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Judith G. Dein and Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11233

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Judith G. Dein

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

3Rd Party Plaintiff

Osteoporosis & Rhematology Center of Tampa Bay, LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

Cynosure Inc

Hologic Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryant Dunivan, Jr.

615 E. De Leon St.

Tampa, FL 33606

Bryant H Dunivan, Jr.

Attorney at Owen & Dunivan, PLLC

615 E. De Leon St.

Tampa, FL 33606

Seth H. Salinger

53 Langley Road, Suite 270

Newton, MA 02459

Natasha G. Nese

Attorney at Office of Attorney Seth Salinger

53 Langley Road, Suite 270

Newton, MA 02459

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Jason Alan Ross

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Jocelyn A. Wiesner

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Michael Joseph Corso

Attorney at Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA

1715 Monroe St, Po Box 280

Ft Myers, FL 33902-0280

Michael J. Pineault

Attorney at Anderson & Kreiger LLP

50 Milk Street, 21St Floor

Boston, MA 02109

Lori B. Leskin

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#89

88 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of BRYANT H. DUNIVAN JR., ESQ.

88 #88

Main Document

#87

84 #1

Exhibit 1

84 #84

Main Document

83 #1

Exhibit 1

83 #83

Main Document

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibits 1 - 8

#1

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • Docket(#92) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 12/10/2021 at 2:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docket(#91) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Status Conference held on 9/23/2021. Case called. Colloquy re: status of case and plan going forward. Court directed the parties to file automatic disclosures within 30 days. Motion to dismiss to be filed 3 weeks from today. Opposition 2 weeks after the motion is filed, and any reply due one week after opposition. Court will set the matter for hearing on motion to dismiss on December 10, 2021 at 2:00 PM. Counsel to file proposed scheduling order. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: B. Dunivan, Jr., M. Pineault, J. Wiesner) (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #88 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bryant H. Dunivan Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) NOTICE of Appearance by Natasha G. Nese on behalf of Osteoporosis & Rhematology Center of Tampa Bay, LLC (Nese, Natasha) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of BRYANT H. DUNIVAN JR., ESQ. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number BMADC-8969695 by Osteoporosis & Rhematology Center of Tampa Bay, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of BRYANT H. DUNIVAN JR., ESQ.)(Salinger, Seth) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth H. Salinger on behalf of Osteoporosis & Rhematology Center of Tampa Bay, LLC (Salinger, Seth) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #84 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lori B. Leskin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jocelyn A. Wiesner. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lori Leskin Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8961297 by Cynosure Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pineault, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jocelyn Wiesner Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8961235 by Cynosure Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pineault, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Leasepoint Funding Group, LLC. Related case(s): no (Krause, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS issued as to Jeffrey Miller, MD PA, Jeffrey Miller, Osteoporosis & Rheumatology of Tampa Bay, LLC. (CRH) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/15/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/1/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/15/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/1/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Leasepoint Funding Group, LLC re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krause, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket(#5) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:20-cv-2038-T-36TGW. (SJB) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Leasepoint Funding Group, LLC. (Krause, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Leasepoint Funding Group, LLC. (Krause, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Leasepoint Funding Group, LLC. (Krause, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Osteoporosis & Rheumatology of Tampa Bay, LLC, Jeffrey Miller, MD PA, Jeffrey Miller (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17249269) filed by Leasepoint Funding Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 8)(Krause, Matthew) Modified text on 9/1/2020 (AG). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLOGIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cynosure, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Pineault

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lori Blake Leskin