This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:16:35 (UTC).

Lear v. Brown et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Lear filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark E. Ford and P. K. Holmes III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02191

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark E. Ford

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Lloyd Lear

Van Buren, AR 72956

Defendants

Jailer Samantha Goodwin

Sheriff Ron Brown

Jailer Boyd

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #8 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) against Boyd, Samantha Goodwin, Ron Brown, filed by Robert Lloyd Lear. Related document: #8 Amended Complaint filed by Robert Lloyd Lear, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Robert Lloyd Lear.(mjm) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) against Boyd, Samantha Goodwin, Ron Brown, filed by Robert Lloyd Lear. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Robert Lloyd Lear.(src) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Crawford County Justice Center to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Crawford County Justice Center). (mjm) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#4

(#4) COMPLETED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Lloyd Lear. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lw) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed. Specifically the Court requires the following information: IFP Application or payment of the $350 filing fee and $50 administrative fee, a total of $400. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 11/10/2020. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of his new address. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 20, 2020. (jlm) Modified on 10/20/2020 to edit text (mjm). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Ron Brown, Samantha Goodwin, filed by Robert Lloyd Lear.(jlm) (lw). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #8 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) against Boyd, Samantha Goodwin, Ron Brown, filed by Robert Lloyd Lear. Related document: #8 Amended Complaint filed by Robert Lloyd Lear, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Robert Lloyd Lear.(mjm) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) against Boyd, Samantha Goodwin, Ron Brown, filed by Robert Lloyd Lear. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Robert Lloyd Lear.(src) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff has not clearly stated how each named Defendant violated his federal constitutional rights, and some of his claims may be frivolous. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 36 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 12/10/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on November 4, 2020. (klk) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Crawford County Justice Center to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Crawford County Justice Center). (mjm) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to the provisions of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, the clerk is directed to collect the $350.00 filing fee from the plaintiff. Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer in which to notify the Court of his new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled "Notice to the Court of Change of Address" and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. Plaintiffs case shall be subject to dismissal if he fails to inform the Court of an address change.. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on November 3, 2020. (klk) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLETED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Lloyd Lear. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lw) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed. Specifically the Court requires the following information: IFP Application or payment of the $350 filing fee and $50 administrative fee, a total of $400. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 11/10/2020. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of his new address. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 20, 2020. (jlm) Modified on 10/20/2020 to edit text (mjm). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Ron Brown, Samantha Goodwin, filed by Robert Lloyd Lear.(jlm) (lw). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less