This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 09:31:38 (UTC).

LEAP Agency, LLC v. Kimball Electronics Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 LEAP Agency, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kimball Electronics Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Justin R. Walker and Claria Horn Boom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00531

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Justin R. Walker

Claria Horn Boom

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEAP Agency, LLC

LEAPFROG, Inc.

Defendants

Kimball Electronics Group, LLC

Kimball Electronics Group, Inc.

Kimball Electronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryce L. Cotton

Attorney at Blackburn Domene & Burchett PLLC

614 W. Main St., Suite 3000

Louisville, KY 40202

Catherine Murr Young

Attorney at Blackburn Domene & Burchett PLLC

614 W. Main St., Suite 3000

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#8

7 #2

Summons issued to Kimball Electronics, Inc.

7 #1

Summons issued to Kimball Electronics Group, Inc.

#7

6 #12

Summons

6 #11

Summons

6 #10

Summons

6 #9

Corporate Disclosure

6 #8

Cover Sheet

6 #7

Exhibit G - Kimball Outstanding Invoices

6 #6

Exhibit F - SOW 2

6 #5

Exhibit E - SOW 1

6 #4

Exhibit D - MSA

6 #2

Exhibit B - KEG, LLC Art of Amendment (Secure)

6 #1

Exhibit A - LEAP Agency LLC Articles

#6

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/22/2020 Dismissing Case. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all defendants. This matter is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. (ALS) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LEAP Agency, LLC (Cotton, Bryce) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the reassignment protocol set forth in GO 20-16, this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Claria H. Boom for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (ALS) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LEAP Agency, LLC. Kimball Electronics Group, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Young, Catherine) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Kimball Electronics Group, Inc., Kimball Electronics Group, LLC, Kimball Electronics, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Kimball Electronics Group, Inc., #2 Summons issued to Kimball Electronics, Inc.) (JM) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LEAP Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LEAP Agency LLC Articles, #2 Exhibit B - KEG, LLC Art of Amendment (Secure), #3 Exhibit C - KEG, Inc. Art of Amendment (Secure), #4 Exhibit D - MSA, #5 Exhibit E - SOW 1, #6 Exhibit F - SOW 2, #7 Exhibit G - Kimball Outstanding Invoices, #8 Cover Sheet, #9 Corporate Disclosure, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons) (Young, Catherine) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SHOW CAUSE ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 8/12/2020: LEAP Agency, LLC may seek leave to amend its Complaint to allege the citizenship of Kimball Electronics Group, LLCs members. If LEAP chooses to seek leave to amend its Complaint, its deadline is 14 days from the entry of this order, with response and reply deadlines in accordance with the Local Rules. cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Kimball Electronics Group, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (SMJ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEAP Agency, LLC. (SMJ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (SMJ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kimball Electronics Group, LLC; Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3150881; filed by LEAP Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LEAP Agency LLC Articles, #2 Exhibit B - MSA, #3 Exhibit C - SOW 1, #4 Exhibit D - SOW 2, #5 Exhibit E - Kimball Outstanding Invoices, #6 Summons, #7 Cover Sheet) (SMJ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC. is a litigant