This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 06:52:16 (UTC).

Lean v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Lean filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Fire Marine Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lurana S. Snow and William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-61856

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elizabeth Lean

David Lean

Defendant

National Fire & Marine Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jared McElwee

Attorney at Cohen Law Group

350 North Lake Destiny Road

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant Attorney

Stephen Paul Smith

Attorney at Marlow Adler Abrams Newman & Lewis

4000 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 570

Coral Gables, FL 33146

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Exhibit Notice of Removal Filed in State Court

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Compliance of Filing Notice Filed in State Court by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal Filed in State Court) (Smith, Stephen) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jared McElwee, mailing date September 14, 2020, (pt) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit Demand Email

1 #5

Exhibit Loss Assessment by Orbis Consulting

1 #4

Exhibit Insurance Policy

1 #3

Exhibit NFM OIR Information

1 #2

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13509011, filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit NFM OIR Information, #4 Exhibit Insurance Policy, #5 Exhibit Loss Assessment by Orbis Consulting, #6 Exhibit Demand Email)(Smith, Stephen) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Compliance of Filing Notice Filed in State Court by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal Filed in State Court) (Smith, Stephen) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jared McElwee, mailing date September 14, 2020, (pt) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13509011, filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit NFM OIR Information, #4 Exhibit Insurance Policy, #5 Exhibit Loss Assessment by Orbis Consulting, #6 Exhibit Demand Email)(Smith, Stephen) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less