This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2021 at 07:19:11 (UTC).

LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA INC et al v. LEE et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA INC filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against LEE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK E WALKER and MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK E WALKER

Referral Judge

MARTIN A FITZPATRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERT BRIGHAM

CECILE SCOON

Defendants

ASHLEY MOODY

JULIE MARCUS

MELISSA ARNOLD

CHRISTINA WHITE

WILLIAM KEEN

MAUREEN BAIRD

DAVID H STAFFORD

TOMMY DOYLE

LAURA HUTTO

LAUREL M LEE

JOSEPH MORGAN

MARK EARLEY

JENNIFER J EDWARDS

DEBORAH OSBORNE

BRENDA HOOTS

TRAVIS HART

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FREDERICK STANTON WERMUTH

Attorney at KING BLACKWELL ZEHNDER ETC PA - ORLANDO FL

25 E Pine St

Orlando, FL 32801

MARC E ELIAS

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP - WASHINGTON DC

700 13Th Street Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

CHRISTINA A FORD

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP - WASHINGTON DC

700 13Th Street Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

ARIA CHRISTINE BRANCH

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP - WASHINGTON DC

700 13Th Street Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

LALITHA D MADDURI

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP - WASHINGTON DC

700 13Th Street Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

THOMAS ALAN ZEHNDER

Attorney at KING BLACKWELL ZEHNDER & WERMUTH PA - ORLANDO FL

25 E Pine Street

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

BILAL AHMED FARUQUI

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Tallahassee, Fl 32399-1050

Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL - PL-01 - TALLAHASSEE FL

400 S Monroe St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

EDWARD PAUL CUFFE

Attorney at MARKS GRAY PA - JACKSONVILLE FL

1200 Riverplace Blvd, Ste 800

Jacksonville, FL 32207

SUSAN SMITH ERDELYI

Attorney at MARKS GRAY PA - JACKSONVILLE FL

1200 Riverplace Blvd, Ste 800

Jacksonville, FL 32207

ANDY V BARDOS

Attorney at GRAYROBINSON PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

301 S Bronough St Ste 600

Tallahassee, FL 32301

ASHLEY E DAVIS

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

Ra Gray Building, 500 South Bronough Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

500 S Bronough Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

GARY VERGIL PERKO

Attorney at HOLTZMAN VOGEL BARAN ET AL - TALLAHASSEE FL

1532 Cristobal Drive

Tallahassee, FL 32303

MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL

Attorney at HOLTZMAN VOGEL BARAN ET AL - TALLAHASSEE FL

5817 Dahlgren Trail

Tallahassee, FL 32312

Other Attorneys

DIANA MASTERS JOHNSON

Attorney at ALACHUA COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE

12 Se 1St Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROBERT CHARLES SWAIN

Attorney at ALACHUA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

12 Se First St, Po Box 2877

Gainesville, FL 32602

FRANK MICHAEL MARI

Attorney at BELL & ROPER PA - ORLANDO FL

2707 E Jefferson St

Orlando, FL 32803

BENJAMIN SALZILLO

Attorney at BROWARD COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE - FORT LAUDERDALE FL

115 S Andrews Ave, Ste 423

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

NATHANIEL ADAM KLITSBERG

Attorney at BROWARD COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE - FORT LAUDERDALE FL

115 S Andrews Ave, Ste 423

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#111

#110

#109

108 #1

Text of Proposed Order Ex. A - Proposed Protective Order

#108

107 #2

Exhibit A

107 #1

Memo. in Support

#107

#106

2 #64

Summons to Deborah Osborne

2 #53

Summons to Julie Marcus

2 #50

Summons to Mary Jane Arrington

2 #43

Summons to Vicki Davis

2 #26

Summons to Brenda Hoots

2 #23

Summons to John Hanlon

2 #21

Summons to Connie Sanchez

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

314 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) MOTION to Extend TimeTo Respond In Regard to Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Secretary of State by BLACK VOTERS MATTER FUND INC, ROBERT BRIGHAM, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS INC, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA EDUCATION FUND INC, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA INC, ALAN MADISON, CECILE SCOON. (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT MAUREEN BAIRD (SCOTT, DALE) Modified to edit title on 7/1/2021 (rcb). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The #108 motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/30/2021. (rcb) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by BLACK VOTERS MATTER FUND INC, ROBERT BRIGHAM, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS INC, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA EDUCATION FUND INC, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA INC, ALAN MADISON, CECILE SCOON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A - Proposed Protective Order) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) SECRETARY OF STATE LEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Memo. in Support, #2 Exhibit A) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified to edit title on 6/28/2021 (rcb). (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED WORD LIMITS - For the sake of clarity, both identical motions, ECF Nos. #103 & #104 , are GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/25/2021. (vkm) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) ORDER GRANTING #104 MOTION TO EXCEED WORD LIMITS.The #104 motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/25/2021. (rcb) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by LAUREL M LEE. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) MOTION to Extend Time by LAUREL M LEE. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN T LAVIA, III on behalf of GERTRUDE WALKER (LAVIA, JOHN) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (MCVAY, BRADLEY) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER ANDERSON, JENNIFER M. KINSEY, VICKY OAKES, GERTRUDE WALKER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SUWANEE COUNTY, #2 Exhibit ST JOHNS COUNTY, #3 Exhibit SEMINOLE COUNTY) (rcb) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to JANET H. ADKINS, MICHAEL BENNETT, MARTY BISHOP, GRANT CONYERS, VICKI DAVIS, TOMMY DOYLE, HEATH DRIGGERS, CAROL DUNAWAY, MARK EARLEY, ALETRIS FARNAM, JOYCE GRIFFIN, TRAVIS HART, ALAN HAYS, TAMMY JONES, CRAIG LATIMER, THERISA MEADOWS, HEATHER RILEY, LESLIE SWAN, CHRISTINA WHITE, WESLEY WILCOX. (Attachments: #1 NASSAU COUNTY, #2 MONROE COUNTY, #3 MIAMI DADE, #4 MARTIN, #5 MARION, #6 MANATEE, #7 MADISON, #8 LEE, #9 JACKSON, #10 LAFAYETTE, #11 JEFFERSON, #12 LIBERTY, #13 LEVY, #14 LEON, #15 INDIAN RIVER, #16 HOLMES, #17 HILLSBOUROUGH, #18 FRANKLIN) (rcb) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN MARK TODD on behalf of CRAIG LATIMER (TODD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to MARK ANDERSEN, MAUREEN BAIRD, KIM A BARTON, TOMI S. BROWN, STARLET CANNON, CHRIS H CHAMBLESS, SHARON CHASON, JENNIFER J EDWARDS, MIKE HOGAN, SHIRLEY KNIGHT, KAITI LENHART, CHRIS MILTON, ASHLEY MOODY, MARK F NEGLEY, HEATHER RILEY, JOE SCOTT, LORI SCOTT, AMANDA SEYFANG, DAVID H STAFFORD, PAUL A STAMOULIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SUMMONS BAY COUNTY, #2 Exhibit SUMMONS CITRUS COUNTY, #3 Exhibit SUMMONS ALACHUA COUNTY, #4 Exhibit SUMMONS COLUMBIA COUNTY, #5 Exhibit SUMMONS CLAY COLUMBIA COUNTY, #6 Exhibit SUMMONS CALHOUN COUNTY, #7 Exhibit SUMMONS DESOTO COUNTY, #8 Exhibit SUMMONS DIXIE COUNTY, #9 Exhibit SUMMONS COLLIER, #10 Exhibit SUMMONS, #11 Exhibit SUMMONS, #12 Exhibit SUMMONS, #13 Exhibit SUMMONS, #14 Exhibit SUMMONS, #15 Exhibit SUMMONS, #16 Exhibit SUMMONS, #17 Exhibit SUMMONS, #18 Exhibit SUMMONS) (rcb) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA A FORD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (FORD, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E ELIAS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Summonses to be Issued by BLACK VOTERS MATTER FUND, INC., ROBERT BRIGHAM, FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, INC., LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA EDUCATION FUND, INC., LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA INC, ALAN MADISON, CECILE SCOON (Attachments: #1 Summons to Ashley Moody, #2 Summons to Kim Barton, #3 Summons to Chris Milton, #4 Summons to Mark Andersen, #5 Summons to Amanda Seyfang, #6 Summons to Lori Scott, #7 Summons to Joe Scott, #8 Summons to Sharon Chason, #9 Summons to Paul Stamoulis, #10 Summons to Maureen Baird, #11 Summons to Chris Chambless, #12 Summons to Jennifer Edwards, #13 Summons to Tomi Brown, #14 Summons to Mark Negley, #15 Summons to Starlet Cannon, #16 Summons to Mike Hogan, #17 Summons to David Stafford, #18 Summons to Kaiti Lenhart, #19 Summons to Heather Riley, #20 Summons to Shirley Knight, #21 Summons to Connie Sanchez, #22 Summons to Aletris Farnam, #23 Summons to John Hanlon, #24 Summons to Laura Hutto, #25 Summons to Diane Smith, #26 Summons to Brenda Hoots, #27 Summons to Shirley Anderson, #28 Summons to Penny Ogg, #29 Summons to Craig Latimer, #30 Summons to Therisa Meadows, #31 Summons to Leslie Swan, #32 Summons to Carol Dunaway, #33 Summons to Marty Bishop, #34 Summons to Travis Hart, #35 Summons to Alan Hays, #36 Summons to Tommy Doyle, #37 Summons to Mark Earley, #38 Summons to Tammy Jones, #39 Summons to Grant Conyers, #40 Summons to Heath Driggers, #41 Summons to Michael Bennett, #42 Summons to Wesley Wilcox, #43 Summons to Vicki Davis, #44 Summons to Christina White, #45 Summons to Joyce Griffin, #46 Summons to Janet Adkins, #47 Summons to Paul Lux, #48 Summons to Melissa Arnold, #49 Summons to Bill Cowles, #50 Summons to Mary Jane Arrington, #51 Summons to Wendy Link, #52 Summons to Brian Corley, #53 Summons to Julie Marcus, #54 Summons to Lori Edwards, #55 Summons to Charles Overturf, #56 Summons to Tappie Villane, #57 Summons to Ron Turner, #58 Summons to Christopher Anderson, #59 Summons to Vicky Oakes, #60 Summons to Gertrude Walker, #61 Summons to William Keen, #62 Summons to Jennifer Kinsey, #63 Summons to Dana Southerland, #64 Summons to Deborah Osborne, #65 Summons to Lisa Lewis, #66 Summons to Joseph Morgan, #67 Summons to Bobby Beasley, #68 Summons to Carol Finch Rudd) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6079446.), filed by ALAN MADISON, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA EDUCATION FUND, INC., LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA INC, ROBERT BRIGHAM, BLACK VOTERS MATTER FUND, INC., FLORIDA ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, INC., CECILE SCOON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (WERMUTH, FREDERICK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANK MICHAEL MARI