This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2021 at 08:45:55 (UTC).

Leadstedt et al v. Arovast Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Leadstedt filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Arovast Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nina Y. Wang and Raymond P. Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00288

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul Alan Leadstedt

C.A.L.

Paul Alan Leafstedt

Defendants

Arovast Corporation

Arovast Corporation a California Corporation doing business as Cosori Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam John Kress

Attorney at Johnson Becker, PLLC

444 Cedar Street, Suite 1800

Saint Paul, MN 55101

Defendant Attorney

David Arthur Turner

Attorney at Yukevitch Cavanaugh

355 South Grand Avenue, 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs C.A.L., Paul Alan Leafstedt All parties do not consent.. (Kress, Adam) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney David Arthur Turner added to party Arovast Corporation(pty:dft) by Arovast Corporation.(Turner, David) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/18/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 3/25/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/1/2021. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 4/8/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by C.A.L., Paul Alan Leafstedt. Arovast Corporation served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Kress, Adam) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit a

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Arovast Corporation (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7692910)Attorney Adam John Kress added to party C.A.L.(pty:pla), Attorney Adam John Kress added to party Paul Alan Leadstedt(pty:pla), filed by C.A.L., Paul Alan Leadstedt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Kress, Adam) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/26/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/26/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00288-RM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs C.A.L., Paul Alan Leafstedt All parties do not consent.. (Kress, Adam) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney David Arthur Turner added to party Arovast Corporation(pty:dft) by Arovast Corporation.(Turner, David) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/18/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 3/25/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/1/2021. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 4/8/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by C.A.L., Paul Alan Leafstedt. Arovast Corporation served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Kress, Adam) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Arovast Corporation (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7692910)Attorney Adam John Kress added to party C.A.L.(pty:pla), Attorney Adam John Kress added to party Paul Alan Leadstedt(pty:pla), filed by C.A.L., Paul Alan Leadstedt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Kress, Adam) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arovast Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CAL AGENTS REALTY, INC. is a litigant