This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2019 at 08:05:21 (UTC).

Leaders Law Firm LLC v. Shang et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 Leaders Law Firm LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Shang. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02630

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leaders Law Firm LLC

Defendants

Quincy A. Shang

The Shang Law Firm, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ramsey A. Knowles

Attorney at Knowles Gallant LLC

6400 Powers Ferry Road, Suite 350

Atlanta, GA 30339

Jared Kim Hodges

Attorney at Knowles Gallant LLC

6400 Powers Ferry Road, Suite 350

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

1 #1

EXHIBIT 1

3 #1

The Shang Law Firm

1 #3

EXHIBIT 3

1 #4

EXHIBIT 4

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) First Certificate of Interested Persons by Leaders Law Firm LLC. (Hodges, Jared) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

1 #6

EXHIBIT 6

1 #2

EXHIBIT 2

#2

(#2) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bdb) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

1 #5

EXHIBIT 5

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Request for Injunctive Relief) filed by Leaders Law Firm LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8716738) (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT 1, #2 EXHIBIT 2, #3 EXHIBIT 3, #4 EXHIBIT 4, #5 EXHIBIT 5, #6 EXHIBIT 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Quincy A. Shang, The Shang Law Firm, P.C. (Attachments: #1 The Shang Law Firm)(bdb) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) First Certificate of Interested Persons by Leaders Law Firm LLC. (Hodges, Jared) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bdb) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Quincy A. Shang, The Shang Law Firm, P.C. (Attachments: #1 The Shang Law Firm)(bdb) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Request for Injunctive Relief) filed by Leaders Law Firm LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8716738) (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT 1, #2 EXHIBIT 2, #3 EXHIBIT 3, #4 EXHIBIT 4, #5 EXHIBIT 5, #6 EXHIBIT 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.