This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2021 at 08:02:29 (UTC).

Le v. Medtronic, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Le filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Hildy Bowbeer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01933

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lane Le

Defendants

Medtronic, Inc.

Covidien, L.P.

Does 1-50

 

Court Documents

30 #1

*Restricted*

#30

(#30) Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02040. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer per 3rd/4th Master List. (Entered: 08/27/2021)

29 #1

Transfer Letter

#29

(#29) Case transferred to District of District of Minnesota. Files transferred electronically to: *District of District of Minnesota*.*300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202**Minneapolis, MN 55415*. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Letter) (jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

14 #2

Request for Judicial Notice

14 #1

Declaration of Amanda Middleton

12 #2

Request for Judicial Notice

12 #1

Declaration of Shelly Zacharias

#12

(#22) REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc. (Herrington, Robert) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to File (Assented to Motion) by Lane Le. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Proposed First Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, Redlined Class Action Complaint)(Lucio, Christina)Attorney Christina Marie Lucio added to party Lane Le(pty:pla) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' deadline to respond to Mr. Les Complaint is now 1/18/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/5/2021. (jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/05/2021)

6 #1

Declaration of Robert J. Herrington

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Herrington)(Herrington, Robert)Attorney Robert J Herrington added to party Covidien, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert J Herrington added to party Medtronic, Inc.(pty:dft) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lane Le Class Action Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Minute Order of Recusal, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lane Le. Medtronic, Inc. served. (Hawkins, James) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lane Le Class Action Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Minute Order of Recusal, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lane Le. Covidien, L.P. served. (Hawkins, James) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Herrington)(Herrington, Robert)Attorney Robert J Herrington added to party Covidien, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert J Herrington added to party Medtronic, Inc.(pty:dft) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/30/2020)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#31) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Christina Marie Lucio, James R. Hawkins, Christiana L. Signs, James.N. Boudreau, Robert J. Herrington, Layal Bishara as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt) cc: Christina Marie Lucio, James R. Hawkins, Christiana L. Signs, James N. Boudreau, Robert J. Herrington, Layal Bishara. (kt) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02040. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer per 3rd/4th Master List. (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Case transferred to District of District of Minnesota. Files transferred electronically to: *District of District of Minnesota*.*300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202**Minneapolis, MN 55415*. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Letter) (jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA, Motions Submitted #14 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. These motions are suitable for determination on the papers and without need for oral argument pursuant to CivLR 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and these motions are deemed submitted as of this date.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Christiana L. Signs, re #25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/9/2021.(rmc) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of James N. Boudreau, re #24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/9/2021.(rmc) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15501695.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Signs, Christiana) (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15501648.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Boudreau, James) (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota filed by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc.. (Herrington, Robert) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc. (Herrington, Robert) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Covidien, L.P., DOES 1-50, Medtronic, Inc., filed by Lane Le. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Exemplar Authorization Forms) (Lucio, Christina) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint. It is ordered that the First Amended Class Action Complaint be filed with the Court via the CM/ECF system with in 7 days of the Court's Order granting leave to file. It is also ordered that Defendants' responsive pleading be due fourteen (14) days after the First Amended Complaint is filed. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/15/2021. (jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to File (Assented to Motion) by Lane Le. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Proposed First Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, Redlined Class Action Complaint)(Lucio, Christina)Attorney Christina Marie Lucio added to party Lane Le(pty:pla) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' deadline to respond to Mr. Les Complaint is now 1/18/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/5/2021. (jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Herrington)(Herrington, Robert)Attorney Robert J Herrington added to party Covidien, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert J Herrington added to party Medtronic, Inc.(pty:dft) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lane Le Class Action Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Minute Order of Recusal, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lane Le. Medtronic, Inc. served. (Hawkins, James) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lane Le Class Action Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Minute Order of Recusal, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lane Le. Covidien, L.P. served. (Hawkins, James) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20CV2040-AJB-BLM.(no document attached) (mme) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Covidien, L.P., DOES 1-50, Medtronic, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14692231.), filed by Lane Le. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2040-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Hawkins, James)(smd) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/27/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COVIDIEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant