This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2020 at 08:55:11 (UTC).

Truong Le v. Armstrong World Industries et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 Truong Le filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Armstrong World Industries. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald S.W. Lew and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04094

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald S.W. Lew

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Truong Le

Defendants

Armstrong Flooring, Inc.

DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive,

Armstrong World Industries

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Azuka L Uzoh

Attorney at Law Office of Azuka L Uzoh

1930 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1216

Los Angeles, CA 90057

Defendant Attorneys

Kristen Jeannine Nesbit

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Anet Medeli Castro Drapalski

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Complaint

1 #2

Request for Dismissal

1 #3

Answer to Complaint

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of LINDSEY A. GROFT re Order to Show Cause #11 filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED to show, in writing, on or before May 29, 2020, evidence of Plaintiffs citizenship or this Action will be remanded. (shb) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 10:00 AM. See order for complete details. (jre) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/1/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C)(ghap) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Defendant Armstrong World Industries without prejudice filed by plaintiff Truong Le. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Armstrong Flooring, Inc., Armstrong World Industries, Does 1 through 100, inclusive Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Truong Le. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/2/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc., identifying Truong Le; and Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Lindsey Groft re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Anet Drapalski re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV08087 Receipt No: ACACDC-26328668 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Request for Dismissal, #3 Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Kristen Jeannine Nesbit added to party Armstrong Flooring, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Armstrong Flooring, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Armstrong World Industries is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Azuka L Uzoh