This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:28:09 (UTC).

Le S Neal v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Le S Neal filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin, Rozella A. Oliver and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00443

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judges

Rozella A. Oliver

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Le S Neal

Defendants

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Does 1-100, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

S Sean Shahabi

Attorney at Jaurigue Law Group

300 West Glenoaks Boulevard Suite 300

Glendale, CA 91202

Michael J Jaurigue

Attorney at Jaurigue Law Group

300 West Glenoaks Boulevard Suite 300

Glendale, CA 91202

Barbara DuVan-Clarke

Attorney at Jurigue Law Group

300 West Glenoaks Boulevard Suite 300

Glendale, CA 91202

Defendant Attorneys

Marytza J Reyes

Attorney at Sanchez and Amador LLP

800 South Figueroa Street Suite 1120

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jessica M Iglesias

Attorney at Sanchez and Amador LLP

800 South Figueroa Street Suite 1120

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment for Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-00443 FMO-ASx. (aco) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (dr) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for March 17, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on Tuesday, April 4, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. (iv) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#12

(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5, filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... (Iglesias, Jessica) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#11

(#11) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Iglesias, Jessica) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/10/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

8 #1

Attachment 1

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

Attachment 1

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jp) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jp) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #4

Declaration of Millicent McLeod

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment for Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-00443 FMO-ASx. (aco) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (dr) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for March 17, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on Tuesday, April 4, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. (iv) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5, filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... (Iglesias, Jessica) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Iglesias, Jessica) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/10/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE to Plaintiff Re Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Iglesias, Jessica) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Jessica M. Iglesias re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Iglesias, Jessica) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/19/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED NO. 1-2 OF EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL ELECTRONICALLY FILED COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Le S Neal against Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Does 1-100. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/22/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED NO. 1-1 OF EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jp) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jp) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Iglesias, Jessica) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., identifying The Home Depot, Inc., Le S. Neal, Jaurigue Law Group, Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.. (Iglesias, Jessica) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV46779 Receipt No: ACACDC-32659898 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Declaration of Millicent McLeod) (Attorney Jessica M Iglesias added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Iglesias, Jessica) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica M Iglesias

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marytza J Reyes